This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2020 at 07:14:21 (UTC).

Silva et al v. B&G Foods, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 Silva filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against B G Foods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Donato and Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00137

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James Donato

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nancy Schier

Sabrina Silva

Defendants

B&G Foods, Inc.

B&G Foods North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory Weston

1405 Morena Blvd, Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92110

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Brooks Borden

Attorney at BraunHagey & Borden LLP

351 California Street, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#20

16 #7

Proposed Order

16 #6

Exhibit 3

16 #5

Exhibit 2

16 #4

Exhibit 1

16 #3

Request for Judicial Notice

16 #2

Declaration of Scott Lerner

16 #1

Declaration of Matthew Borden

#16

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Judge Jon S. TigarPlaintiffs have filed an amended complaint. ECF No. #20 . Defendants' motion to dismiss the original complaint, ECF No. #16 , is therefore terminated as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AMENDED COMPLAINT against B&G Foods North America, Inc., B&G Foods, Inc.. Filed byNancy Schier, Sabrina Silva. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 2/28/2020) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss ) Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Notice of Election to Amend Complaint filed byNancy Schier, Sabrina Silva. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 2/21/2020) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Certificate of Interested Entities by Nancy Schier, Sabrina Silva (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Certificate of Interested Entities by B&G Foods North America, Inc., B&G Foods, Inc. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss filed by B&G Foods North America, Inc., B&G Foods, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/21/2020. Replies due by 2/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Borden, #2 Declaration of Scott Lerner, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Proposed Order)(Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 2/7/2020) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2020) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by B&G Foods North America, Inc., B&G Foods, Inc., Sabrina Silva, Nancy Schier. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/31/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 01/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER TO RELATE CASE 3:20-cv-00137-JD TO 4:15-cv-03772-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 29, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-3 filed by B&G Foods North America, Inc., B&G Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 1/23/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Brooks Borden (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 1/23/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Schier, Sabrina Silva. B&G Foods, Inc. served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 1/20/2020) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Schier, Sabrina Silva. B&G Foods North America, Inc. served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 1/16/2020) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to B&G Foods North America, Inc., B&G Foods, Inc. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2020 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nancy Schier, Sabrina Silva.. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14044364.). Filed byNancy Schier, Sabrina Silva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B/G Foods is a litigant

Latest cases where B & G FOODS NORTH AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Weston