This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2021 at 08:30:38 (UTC).

Sills v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Sills filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard M Gergel and Molly H Cherry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-02907

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

Referral Judge

Molly H Cherry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tammy R Lucas Sills

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Interested Parties

Social Security Administrative Record

US Attorney - Social Security Noticing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W Daniel Mayes

Attorney at Smith Massey Brodie Thumond Guynn and Mayes

Po Drawer 2650

Aiken, SC 29802

Defendant Attorney

Katie M Gaughan

Attorney at Social Security Administration

300 Spring Garden Street, 6Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19123

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 9/13/2021. (tsim, ) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER/ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Brief due by 11/12/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8)(Gaughan, Katie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 9/13/2021. (tsim, ) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#4) Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Standing Order 3:21-mc-00212- RBH signed by Chief Judge R. Bryan Harwell, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Set Answer Deadline - Social Security Complaint: Answer due from Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 3/9/2022. (tsim, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Tammy R Lucas Sills. Response to Motion due by 9/24/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Molly H Cherry. (tsim, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Tammy R Lucas Sills. Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website. (tsim, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Noticing is a litigant

Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant