This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2021 at 10:48:32 (UTC).

Sileoni v. Shelby et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Sileoni filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Shelby. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is B. Lynn Winmill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00006

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

B. Lynn Winmill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maximiliano Sileoni

Boise, ID 83707

Defendants

Robertson

Nettell

Donlong

Shelby

Smith

Martinez-Creg

Walles

Mezo

Moor

Jackson

 

Court Documents

10 #1

attachment

#10

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

#2

7 #3

part 13 continued

7 #2

part 13 of 13

7 #1

part 12 of 13

#7

6 #3

part 10 of 13

6 #2

part 9 of 13

6 #1

part 8 continued

#6

5 #3

part 7 continued

5 #2

part 7 of 13

5 #1

part 6 of 13

3 #1

Motion continued

#3

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER FOR AMENDMENT. Within 30 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint. Plaintiff's Motion to Display Exhibits (Dkt #3 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Dkt #8 ) is deemed MOOT. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Attachments: #1 attachment)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #8 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maximiliano Sileoni. (alw) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Maximiliano Sileoni. Responses due by 2/1/2021 (alw) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Parts 11-13 of 13 filed by Maximiliano Sileoni re (3 in 1:21-cv-00008-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00004-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00010-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00007-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00006-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00009-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00005-BLW) MOTION. (Attachments: #1 part 12 of 13, #2 part 13 of 13, #3 part 13 continued)Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00004-BLW et al.(jp) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Parts 8-10 of 13by Plaintiffs Maximiliano Sileoni re (3 in 1:21-cv-00008-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00004-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00010-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00007-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00006-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00009-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00005-BLW) MOTION. (Attachments: #1 part 8 continued, #2 part 9 of 13, #3 part 10 of 13)Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00004-BLW et al.(jp) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Parts 5-7 of 13 by Plaintiffs Maximiliano Sileoni re (3 in 1:21-cv-00008-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00004-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00010-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00007-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00006-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00009-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00005-BLW) MOTION. (Attachments: #1 part 6 of 13, #2 part 7 of 13, #3 part 7 continued)Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00004-BLW et al.(jp) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Parts 2-4 of 13 by Plaintiffs Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni re (3 in 1:21-cv-00008-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00004-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00010-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00007-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00006-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00009-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00005-BLW) MOTION. (Attachments: #1 part 3 of 13, #2 part 4 of 13)Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00004-BLW et al.(jp) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Display Exhibits by Plaintiffs Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni. Responses due by 1/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Motion continued)Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00004-BLW et al.(jp) (originally filed in case 20-cv-508) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maximiliano Sileoni. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 3 continued)(jp)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mezo is a litigant

Latest cases where Moor is a litigant

Latest cases where Shelby is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERTSON is a litigant