This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2021 at 10:48:52 (UTC).

Sileoni v. Bixby et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Sileoni filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Bixby. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is B. Lynn Winmill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00008

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

B. Lynn Winmill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maximiliano Sileoni

Boise, ID 83707

Defendants

Baumgartner

Bixby

Boggs

Eliason

Berrett

Berry

Barnes

Hartt

Christensen

McKay

Idalee Le

Dr. Berry

Clinician Baumgartner

Dr. Patchett

Clinician Barnes

Deputy Warden McKay

Warden Christensen

Clinician Idalee Le

Clinician Hartt

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

10 #1

Amended Complaint Form

#10

8 #1

cover sheet

#8

#2

7 #3

part 13 continued

7 #2

part 13 of 13

7 #1

part 12 of 13

#7

6 #3

part 10 of 13

6 #2

part 9 of 13

6 #1

part 8 continued

#6

3 #1

Motion continued

#3

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maximiliano Sileoni.(jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION New Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Maximiliano Sileoni. Responses due by 3/12/2021. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER FOR AMENDMENT, Within 30 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint on the "Prisoner Civil Rights Amended Complaint Form" to correct the deficiencies in the original Complaint. Alternatively, Plaintiff may submit a notice of voluntary dismissal. If Plaintiff does nothing further within this time frame, his entire case will be dismissed. Plaintiff's Motion for Display Exhibits (Dkt. #3 ) is GRANTED, to the extent that Plaintiff's exhibits from Case No. 1:20-cv-508 have been docketed in this case. Plaintiff shall not resubmit any of those exhibits with his amended complaint but shall refer to them by exhibit names or numbers only. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt #8 ) is DENIED as MOOT. The Court will revisit it if Plaintiff is permitted to proceed. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #8 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maximiliano Sileoni. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Maximiliano Sileoni. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 cover sheet)(jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Parts 11-13 of 13 filed by Maximiliano Sileoni re (3 in 1:21-cv-00008-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00004-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00010-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00007-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00006-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00009-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00005-BLW) MOTION. (Attachments: #1 part 12 of 13, #2 part 13 of 13, #3 part 13 continued)Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00004-BLW et al.(jp) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Parts 8-10 of 13by Plaintiffs Maximiliano Sileoni re (3 in 1:21-cv-00008-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00004-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00010-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00007-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00006-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00009-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00005-BLW) MOTION. (Attachments: #1 part 8 continued, #2 part 9 of 13, #3 part 10 of 13)Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00004-BLW et al.(jp) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Parts 5-7 of 13 by Plaintiffs Maximiliano Sileoni re (3 in 1:21-cv-00008-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00004-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00010-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00007-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00006-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00009-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00005-BLW) MOTION. (Attachments: #1 part 6 of 13, #2 part 7 of 13, #3 part 7 continued)Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00004-BLW et al.(jp) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Parts 2-4 of 13 by Plaintiffs Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni re (3 in 1:21-cv-00008-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00004-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00010-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00007-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00006-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00009-BLW, 3 in 1:21-cv-00005-BLW) MOTION. (Attachments: #1 part 3 of 13, #2 part 4 of 13)Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00004-BLW et al.(jp) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Display Exhibits by Plaintiffs Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni, Maximiliano Sileoni. Responses due by 1/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Motion continued)Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00004-BLW et al.(jp) (originally filed in case 20-cv-508) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maximiliano Sileoni. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 3 continued)(jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NNC THE BIXBY LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Baumgartner is a litigant

Latest cases where Eliason is a litigant

Latest cases where Boggs is a litigant