This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/30/2021 at 07:11:21 (UTC).

SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORP. v. STINGRAY IP SOLUTIONS, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/31/2021 SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORP filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against STINGRAY IP SOLUTIONS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-11989

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORP.

Defendant

STINGRAY IP SOLUTIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WADE G. PERRIN

Defendant Attorneys

ERIC I. ABRAHAM

NAKUL Y. SHAH

 

Court Documents

28 #9

Text of Proposed Order

28 #8

Exhibit G

28 #7

Exhibit F

28 #5

Exhibit D

28 #4

Exhibit C

28 #3

Exhibit B

28 #2

Exhibit A

28 #1

Brief

#28

1 #14

Certification (Local Rule 11.2)

1 #13

Exhibit K

1 #12

Exhibit J

1 #11

Exhibit I

1 #7

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit A

#1

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSet Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 8/16/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) MOTION to Dismiss by STINGRAY IP SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAHAM, ERIC) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021

DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, HUNTER PALMER, DANIEL OLEJKO, MARCUS BENAVIDES and TERRY SAAD, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Terry Saad, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12648627.) (ABRAHAM, ERIC) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Marcus Benavides, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12648339.) (ABRAHAM, ERIC) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel Olejko, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12648224.) (ABRAHAM, ERIC) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Hunter Palmer, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12648190.) (ABRAHAM, ERIC) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel as to Terry Saad, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/20/2021. (jem) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel as to Daniel Olejko, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/20/2021. (jem) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel as to Hunter Palmer, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/20/2021. (jem) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
06/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until 7/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/22/2021. (jem) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint From June 21, 2021 to July 21, 2021 by STINGRAY IP SOLUTIONS, LLC re #1 Complaint,. (ABRAHAM, ERIC) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by NAKUL Y. SHAH on behalf of STINGRAY IP SOLUTIONS, LLC (SHAH, NAKUL) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC I. ABRAHAM on behalf of STINGRAY IP SOLUTIONS, LLC (ABRAHAM, ERIC) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action with Complaint for Declaratory Judgment served on STINGRAY IP SOLUTIONS, LLC c/o Registered Agent, REGISTERED AGENT SOLUTIONS, INC. on June 1, 2021, filed by SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORP.. (PERRIN, WADE) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to STINGRAY IP SOLUTIONS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (jal, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2021

DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORP. identifying Signify, N.V. as Corporate Parent.. (PERRIN, WADE) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against STINGRAY IP SOLUTIONS, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12506588) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Certification (Local Rule 11.2))(PERRIN, WADE) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less