This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:48:54 (UTC).

Signature Land Development Corporation et al v. Byron, Township of

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 Signature Land Development Corporation filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Byron, Township of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Jonker and Phillip J. Green. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00230

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Jonker

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Signature Land Development Corporation

Marlene J. Sterk

Harriet Rose Myerink

Defendant

Byron, Township of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey G. Muth

Attorney at Miller Johnson PLC (Grand Rapids)

45 Ottawa Sw, Ste. 1100, P.O. Box 306

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0306

Defendant Attorney

Craig R. Noland

Attorney at McGraw Morris PC (GR)

300 Ottawa Ave., Nw, Ste. 820

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting STIPULATION to dismiss #11 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of dismissal by plaintiffs Harriet Rose Myerink, Signature Land Development Corporation, Marlene J. Sterk (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Muth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/31/2019 at 10:00 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 5/24/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting STIPULATION #7 ; terminating PROPOSED ORDER #8 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED ORDER regarding Extending Deadline Responsive Pleadings by defendant Byron, Township of (Noland, Craig) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION Extending Deadline Responsive Pleadings by defendant Byron, Township of (Noland, Craig) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Byron, Township of served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019 (Muth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Byron, Township of (ns) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ns) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Signature Land Development Corporation (Muth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Muth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting STIPULATION to dismiss #11 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION of dismissal by plaintiffs Harriet Rose Myerink, Signature Land Development Corporation, Marlene J. Sterk (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Muth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/31/2019 at 10:00 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 5/24/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting STIPULATION #7 ; terminating PROPOSED ORDER #8 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROPOSED ORDER regarding Extending Deadline Responsive Pleadings by defendant Byron, Township of (Noland, Craig) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION Extending Deadline Responsive Pleadings by defendant Byron, Township of (Noland, Craig) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Craig R. Noland on behalf of defendant Byron, Township of (Noland, Craig) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Byron, Township of served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019 (Muth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Byron, Township of (ns) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ns) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Signature Land Development Corporation (Muth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Muth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Marlene J. Sterk, Harriet Rose Myerink, Signature Land Development Corporation in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4397500 (Muth, Jeffrey) Modified text on 3/26/2019 (jlg) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Byron, Township of filed by Signature Land Development Corporation, Marlene J. Sterk, Harriet Rose Myerink (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Muth, Jeffrey) Modified text on 3/26/2019 (jlg) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less