This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2021 at 07:47:19 (UTC).

Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc. v. Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-09353

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc.

Defendant

NEIGHBORHOOD RADIOLOGY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brett Van Benthysen

Attorney at Reitler Kailas & Rosenblatt LLC

885 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Brett Van Benthysen dated December 19, 2020.. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/21/2020) Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC answer due 1/15/2021 (ks) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#7

(#7) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Brett Van Benthysen dated December 19, 2020. Document filed by Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc...(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 12/19/2020)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC served on 11/20/2020, answer due 12/11/2020. Service was accepted by Sean Martin, Secretary. Document filed by Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc...(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC..(dnh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc...(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent InterMed Holdings, LLC for Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc.. Document filed by Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc...(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NEIGHBORHOOD RADIOLOGY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22492876)Document filed by Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc...(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Brett Van Benthysen dated December 19, 2020.. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/21/2020) Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC answer due 1/15/2021 (ks) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Brett Van Benthysen dated December 19, 2020. Document filed by Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc...(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 12/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC served on 11/20/2020, answer due 12/11/2020. Service was accepted by Sean Martin, Secretary. Document filed by Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc...(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC..(dnh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc...(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brett Van Benthysen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NEIGHBORHOOD RADIOLOGY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brett Van Benthysen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $316,331,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000;. (jgo) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Brett Van Benthysen. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent InterMed Holdings, LLC for Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc.. Document filed by Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc...(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NEIGHBORHOOD RADIOLOGY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22492876)Document filed by Sigma Imaging Technologies, Inc...(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brett Van Benthysen