This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2019 at 07:45:42 (UTC).

Siggers v. Forrest County, Mississippi

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Siggers filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Forrest County, Mississippi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael T. Parker and Keith Starrett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00104

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

Presiding Judge

Keith Starrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clifton Lee Siggers

Hattiesburg, MS 39401

Defendants

Forrest County Jail

Forrest County, Mississippi

Marcol Smith

Elias Lover

Justin Graham

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Forrest County Jail, filed by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope) (CS) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

1 #1

Notice of Assignment

1 #2

Envelope

#2

(#8) ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 , #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 07/25/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Forrest County Sheriff's Office] (CS) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#3

(#6) Acknowledgment of Receipt as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (CS) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 07/15/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#5

(#5) AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

5 #1

Envelope

6 #1

Cover Letter

#15

(#15) MOTION to Subpoena Incident Report and Video by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER denying #15 Motion to Produce. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 3, 2019. (MMc) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

15 #1

Envelope

22 #1

Envelope

#22

(#22) Letter from Clifton Lee Siggers requesting Court to review #15 Motion. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER, Clerk is directed to edit the short title of the instant civil action to Siggers v. Forrest County, Mississippi. Clerk shall edit Defendant CO #24 to Justin Graham, C.O. #24 and CO #60 to Marcol Smith, C.O. #60. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 08/20/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#20

(#20) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Elias Lover, Correctional Officer #71, formerly employed by Forrest County, Mississippi on 08/20/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/20/2019. (CS) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#19

(#19) ORDER, Clerk shall edit the name of Defendant CO #71 to Elias Lover, Correctional Officer #71 formerly employed by Forrest County, Mississippi. Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit for Defendant Elias Lover and send via first class mail to Elias Lover at the address provided in the Sealed Document #18 . The Defendant is directed to file a signed Waiver form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 08/20/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Waiver of Service) (CS) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

19 #2

Waiver of Service

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER denying #15 Motion to Produce. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 3, 2019. (MMc) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Letter from Clifton Lee Siggers requesting Court to review #15 Motion. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER, Clerk is directed to edit the short title of the instant civil action to Siggers v. Forrest County, Mississippi. Clerk shall edit Defendant CO #24 to Justin Graham, C.O. #24 and CO #60 to Marcol Smith, C.O. #60. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 08/20/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Elias Lover, Correctional Officer #71, formerly employed by Forrest County, Mississippi on 08/20/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/20/2019. (CS) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER, Clerk shall edit the name of Defendant CO #71 to Elias Lover, Correctional Officer #71 formerly employed by Forrest County, Mississippi. Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit for Defendant Elias Lover and send via first class mail to Elias Lover at the address provided in the Sealed Document #18 . The Defendant is directed to file a signed Waiver form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 08/20/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Waiver of Service) (CS) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Sealed Document RE: #12 Order. (CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C.O. #60, C.O. #24. C.O. #60 waiver sent on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; C.O. #24 waiver sent on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Allen, William) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Forrest County, Mississippi. Forrest County, Mississippi waiver sent on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Allen, William) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Subpoena Incident Report and Video by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER, the Court hereby refers this cause to United States Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker for all further proceedings to include conducting hearings and submitting to the district judge assigned to this cause proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of this cause. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 08/09/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Response to #9 ORDER filed by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER, on or before August 16, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 07/25/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 , #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 07/25/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Forrest County Sheriff's Office] (CS) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (CS) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Acknowledgment of Receipt as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (CS) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 07/15/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 07/16/2019. (CS) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Forrest County Jail, filed by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope) (CS) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.