This case was last updated from PACER on 06/26/2020 at 09:50:11 (UTC).

Sigal et al v. Bean et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 Sigal filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Bean. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Albregts and Richard F. Boulware, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00755

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeremy E Sigal

Las Vegas, NV 89109

Stephanie L. Sibley

Las Vegas, NV 89109

Defendants

Jennifer Nash

Hubbard-Pickett

Ternes

Shelley Carrao

Nordgren

Dwayne Deal

Manuel Portillo

Nedza

Woodward

Brian Williams

Michael Sweeten

Jeremy Bean

Wendy Remmers

Jackson

Anne Carpenter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Evan David Schwab

Attorney at Schwab Law Firm PLLC

7455 Arroyo Crossing Pkwy., Ste. 220

Las Vegas, NV 89113

Kerry P. Faughnan

P.O. Box 335361

North Las Vegas, NV 89033

Defendant Attorney

Katlyn Brady

Attorney at Nevada Office of the Attorney General

555 E. Washington Ave.

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Jeremy Bean, Dwayne Deal, Hubbard-Pickett, Jennifer Nash, Manuel Portillo, Ternes, Brian Williams. (Brady, Katlyn) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Evan David Schwab on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy E Sigal. (Schwab, Evan) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff Stephanie L Sibley Only. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#8

(#8) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Jeremy Bean, Dwayne Deal, Hubbard-Pickett, Jennifer Nash, Manuel Portillo, Ternes, Brian Williams. (Brady, Katlyn) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Stephanie L Sibley only by Plaintiff Stephanie L. Sibley. (Faughnan, Kerry) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Kerry P. Faughnan on behalf of Plaintiff Stephanie L. Sibley. (Faughnan, Kerry) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Jeremy Bean, Anne Carpenter, Shelley Carrao, Dwayne Deal, Hubbard-Pickett, Jackson, Jennifer Nash, Manuel Portillo, Michael Sweeten, Ternes, Brian Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brady, Katlyn) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#2

(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/27/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/12/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-807589-C, (Filing fee $ 400) (Receipt number 0978-5982480) by Manuel Portillo, Hubbard-Pickett, Jeremy Bean, Dwayne Deal, Ternes, Brian Williams, Jennifer Nash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (MMM) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Jeremy Bean, Dwayne Deal, Hubbard-Pickett, Jennifer Nash, Manuel Portillo, Ternes, Brian Williams. (Brady, Katlyn) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Evan David Schwab on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy E Sigal. (Schwab, Evan) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff Stephanie L Sibley Only. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Jeremy Bean, Dwayne Deal, Hubbard-Pickett, Jennifer Nash, Manuel Portillo, Ternes, Brian Williams. (Brady, Katlyn) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Stephanie L Sibley only by Plaintiff Stephanie L. Sibley. (Faughnan, Kerry) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Kerry P. Faughnan on behalf of Plaintiff Stephanie L. Sibley. (Faughnan, Kerry) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #4 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-3(b). Copies of pleadings or other documents filed in the pending matter must not be attached as exhibits or made part of an appendix. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Jeremy Bean, Anne Carpenter, Shelley Carrao, Dwayne Deal, Hubbard-Pickett, Jackson, Jennifer Nash, Manuel Portillo, Michael Sweeten, Ternes, Brian Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brady, Katlyn) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/27/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/12/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MMM) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-807589-C, (Filing fee $ 400) (Receipt number 0978-5982480) by Manuel Portillo, Hubbard-Pickett, Jeremy Bean, Dwayne Deal, Ternes, Brian Williams, Jennifer Nash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (MMM) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Woodward on behalf of CWS Compensation., Robert N is a litigant

Latest cases where JACKSON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katlyn Brady