This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2020 at 08:36:43 (UTC).

Sietos v. Owners Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Sietos filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Owners Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are N. Reid Neureiter and Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03101

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

N. Reid Neureiter

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anna Sietos

Defendant

Owners Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dominic Xavier Genco

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Joseph Anton Sirchio

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Hannah Rachel Seifert

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Owners Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

18 #1

State Court Docket Sheet

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Owners Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet)(Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Owners Insurance Company.(Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Anton Sirchio on behalf of Anna SietosAttorney Joseph Anton Sirchio added to party Anna Sietos(pty:pla) (Sirchio, Joseph) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dominic Xavier Genco on behalf of Anna SietosAttorney Dominic Xavier Genco added to party Anna Sietos(pty:pla) (Genco, Dominic) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Evan Bennett Stephenson on behalf of Owners Insurance CompanyAttorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 16 October 2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#8

(#17) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Owners Insurance Company.(Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

1 #15

State Court - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet - 8-31-20

1 #14

State Court - Pretrial Order - 9-1-20

1 #7

State Court - Affidavit of Service - Summons and Amended Complaint - 9-15-20

1 #6

State Court - Complaint - 8-31-20

1 #5

Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit D - Thomson Reuters' PeopleMap - DMV Records - Honda

1 #3

Exhibit C - Thomson Reuters' PeopleMap - DMV Records - Subaru

1 #2

Exhibit B - Thomson Reuters' PeopleMap - Real Property Records

1 #1

Exhibit A - Colorado Secretary of State Inquiry

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #19 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03101-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Owners Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Owners Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet)(Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Owners Insurance Company.(Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2020
  • Docket(#16) Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 12-21-2020 at 11:00 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 12-14-2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#10] is due 12-14-2020. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10-17-2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 10/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Anton Sirchio on behalf of Anna SietosAttorney Joseph Anton Sirchio added to party Anna Sietos(pty:pla) (Sirchio, Joseph) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dominic Xavier Genco on behalf of Anna SietosAttorney Dominic Xavier Genco added to party Anna Sietos(pty:pla) (Genco, Dominic) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Evan Bennett Stephenson on behalf of Owners Insurance CompanyAttorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #11 . This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03101-SKC. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 16 October 2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. By Andrew PatrickMcCallin, District Court Judge, Denver City and County on 10/07/2020.(jsalz, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Owners Insurance Company, filed by Anna Sietos.(jsalz, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FIRST AMEDNED [sic] COMPLAINT against Auto Owners Insurance Company, filed by Anna Sietos.(jsalz, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint upon Auto Owners Insurance Company on September 15, 2020 (jsalz, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Auto Owners Insurance Company, filed by Anna Sietos.(jsalz, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (jsalz, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Owners Insurance Company. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Owners Insurance Company from District Court, Denver, County, Colorado, Case Number 2020CV033006. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7540840), filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Colorado Secretary of State Inquiry, #2 Exhibit B - Thomson Reuters' PeopleMap - Real Property Records, #3 Exhibit C - Thomson Reuters' PeopleMap - DMV Records - Subaru, #4 Exhibit D - Thomson Reuters' PeopleMap - DMV Records - Honda, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 State Court - Complaint - 8-31-20, #7 State Court - Affidavit of Service - Summons and Amended Complaint - 9-15-20, #8 State Court - Summons - 8-31-20, #9 State Court - First Amended Complaint - 9-9-20, #10 State Court - Second Amended Complaint - 9-28-20, #11 State Court - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint - 10-6-20, #12 State Court - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint - 10-7-20, #13 State Court - Delay Reduction Order - 9-1-20, #14 State Court - Pretrial Order - 9-1-20, #15 State Court - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet - 8-31-20, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dominic Xavier Genco

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Anton Sirchio