This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2019 at 07:56:14 (UTC).

Sierra-Lopez, Kevin v. Mink, Angela et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Sierra-Lopez, Kevin filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Mink, Angela. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez

Boscobel, WI 53805

Defendants

Michael Kemerling

Mary Taylor

Craig Tom

Angela Mink

C/O Ech

Barbara Schaefer

Paul Mariskanish

Daryl Flannery

C/O Eck

Not Classified By Court

WSPF Prison Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Kevin Sierra-Lopez assessed an initial partial filing fee of $0.43 due 2/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/1/2019. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Inmate Trust Fund Account Statement due 1/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/10/2019. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit $400 or Motion for IFP by 01/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/09/2019. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#16

(#16) Warden PLRA Letter. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#13

(#13) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#11

(#11) Affidavit of Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#10

(#10) Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

9 #1

Pages form complaint

#9

(#9) SUPPLEMENT TO COMPLAINT / Letter from plaintiff clarifying the spelling of defendant Eck's name. (Attachments: #1 Amended pages 1, 3, 4, 5 of complaint) (jef),(ps) Modified docket text on 1/25/2019 (jef). (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#7

(#7) Brief in Support of #6 Motion for Order to Show Cause for Injunction and/or TRO by Plaintiff Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#6

(#6) Motion for Order to Show Cause for Injunction and/or TRO / Proposed Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#4

(#4) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

2 #1

Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet

#2

(#2) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (rks) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Warden PLRA Letter. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Partial Filing fee received : $ 0.43, receipt number 34690033939. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Kevin Sierra-Lopez assessed an initial partial filing fee of $0.43 due 2/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/1/2019. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez. (nln),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2019: #1 IPP Calculation) (nln). (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting plaintiff's #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Trust Fund Account Statement due 2/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/25/2019. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Affidavit of Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUPPLEMENT TO COMPLAINT / Letter from plaintiff clarifying the spelling of defendant Eck's name. (Attachments: #1 Amended pages 1, 3, 4, 5 of complaint) (jef),(ps) Modified docket text on 1/25/2019 (jef). (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Affidavit of Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez re: #6 Motion for Order to Show Cause for Injunction and/or TRO. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Brief in Support of #6 Motion for Order to Show Cause for Injunction and/or TRO by Plaintiff Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion for Order to Show Cause for Injunction and/or TRO / Proposed Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Inmate Trust Fund Account Statement due 1/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/10/2019. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit $400 or Motion for IFP by 01/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/09/2019. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kevin E. Sierra-Lopez. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (rks) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.