This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 10:24:27 (UTC).

Sierra Club v. Woodville Pellets LLC

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Sierra Club filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Woodville Pellets LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-MC-00573

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Sierra Club

Petitioner

Trinity Consultants, Inc.

Defendant

Woodville Pellets LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

George E. Hays

Attorney at Law Office of George E. Hays

P.O. Box 843

Bellevue, WA 98009

Petitioner Attorneys

Barrett C. Lesher

Attorney at Hallett & Perrin, P.C.

1445 Ross Avenue, Suite 2400

Dallas, TX 75202

Katrisha L. Shirley

Attorney at Hallett & Perrin, PC

1445 Ross Avenue, Suite 2400

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

Mike Stenglein

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

401 Congress, Suite 3200

Austin, TX 78701

Steven Mark Zager

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

500 W. 2Nd St., Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

Craig A. Stanfield

Attorney at King and Spalding

1100 Louisiana, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77002

Christie L. Cardon

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1100 Louisiana, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Proposed Order

4 #11

Proposed Order

4 #10

Exhibit 10

4 #9

Exhibit 9

4 #8

Exhibit 8

4 #7

Exhibit 7

4 #6

Exhibit 6

4 #5

Exhibit 5

4 #4

Exhibit 4

4 #3

Exhibit 3

4 #2

Exhibit 2

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) Opposed MOTION to Quash or Modify, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Protective Order as to, Plaintiff's Subpoena to Third-Party Trinity Consultants, Inc. by Woodville Pellets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Proposed Order)(Stanfield, Craig) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

1 #4

Proposed Order

1 #3

Cover Letter, Civil Cover Sheet, Receipt, and Envelope

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) MOTION to Quash ($49.00 Filing Fee #100040105) by Trinity Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Cover Letter, Civil Cover Sheet, Receipt, and Envelope, #4 Proposed Order)(cj) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in TX Eastern District as case number 9:21-mc-00005. (jv2) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred: #4 Opposed MOTION to Quash or Modify, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Protective Order as to, Plaintiff's Subpoena to Third-Party Trinity Consultants, Inc., #1 MOTION to Quash (jv2) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed #5 Motion to Transfer the Motions to Quash. The Court HEREBY Transfers the Motions to Quash (Dkts. 1 and 4) to the Lufkin Division of the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (jv2) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRED: referred #5 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f). Referral Judge: Susan Hightower. (jv2) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRED: referred #4 Opposed MOTION to Quash or Modify, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Protective Order as to, Plaintiff's Subpoena to Third-Party Trinity Consultants, Inc.. Referral Judge: Susan Hightower. (jv2) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order REFERRING #5 Motion to Transfer Case entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's motion to transfer, (Dkt. 5), is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aa2) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order REFERRING #4 Motion to Quash entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to quash, (Dkt. 4), is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aa2) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f) by Woodville Pellets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stanfield, Craig) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Opposed MOTION to Quash or Modify, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Protective Order as to, Plaintiff's Subpoena to Third-Party Trinity Consultants, Inc. by Woodville Pellets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Proposed Order)(Stanfield, Craig) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Sierra Club, re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Movant Trinity Consultants, Inc. (Hays, George) (Entered: 07/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George E. Hays on behalf of Sierra Club. Attorney George E. Hays added to party Sierra Club(pty:res) (Hays, George) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRED: referred #1 MOTION to Quash. Referral Judge: Susan Hightower. (jv2) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order REFERRING #1 Motion to Quash entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to quash, (Dkt. 1), is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aa2) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Quash ($49.00 Filing Fee #100040105) by Trinity Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Cover Letter, Civil Cover Sheet, Receipt, and Envelope, #4 Proposed Order)(cj) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sierra Club is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barrett Chistopher Lesher