This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2021 at 09:53:00 (UTC).

Sierra 6300, LLC v. Everest Indemnity Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Sierra 6300, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jason K. Pulliam and Henry J. Bemporad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00279

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jason K. Pulliam

Referral Judge

Henry J. Bemporad

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sierra 6300, LLC

Defendant

Everest Indemnity Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel W. Packard

Attorney at Packard Law Firm

1100 N.W. Loop 410, Suite 104

San Antonio, TX 78213

Defendant Attorneys

Brian S. Martin

Attorney at Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, LLP

One Riverway, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77056

Christopher H. Avery

Attorney at Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, L.L.P.

One Riverway Drive, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Consent

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet JS-44

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry J. Bemporad: Pretrial Conference held on 5/14/2021 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(mgr) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 8/12/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2021, Discovery due by 11/15/2021, Motions due by 12/15/2021,. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Scheduling Recommendations by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company and Sierra 6300, LLC. (Avery, Christopher) Modified on 5/11/2021 To edit text (bc). (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company and Sierra 6300, LLC. (Avery, Christopher) Modified on 5/11/2021 To edit text (bc). (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company . (Avery, Christopher) Modified on 5/11/2021 To edit text (bc). (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Advisory to Clerk of Court re Magistrate Judge by Sierra 6300, LLC re #4 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER ( Scheduling Recommendations due by 5/10/2021 and Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2021 1:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad). Right to Consent. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Attachments: #1 Consent)(bc) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, the JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. (Avery, Christopher) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14605411), filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Avery, Christopher) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel W. Packard