This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2021 at 10:23:38 (UTC).

Sierks v. Prairie Township Fire Protection District et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 Sierks filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Prairie Township Fire Protection District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen R. Bough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00983

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen R. Bough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zachariah Sierks

Defendants

Mike Boinski

Berry Jennings

Sally Haynes

Prairie Township Fire Protection District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sylvia Alejandra Hernandez

Robin Koogler

Eric E. Vernon

C. Kevin Baldwin

Defendant Attorney

Steven H Schwartz

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

MAP General Order

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket(#11) Before the Court is Attorney W. Joseph Hatley's Motion to Withdraw. (Doc. #10). The motion is GRANTED. Attorney W. Joseph Hatley is hereby removed as counsel of record for all Defendants. Signed on 2/9/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to withdraw as attorney for defendants filed by W. Joseph Hatley on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/23/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hatley, W.) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of appearance by Steven H Schwartz on behalf of Mike Boinski, Sally Haynes, Berry Jennings, Prairie Township Fire Protection District (Attorney Steven H Schwartz added to party Mike Boinski(pty:dft), Attorney Steven H Schwartz added to party Sally Haynes(pty:dft), Attorney Steven H Schwartz added to party Berry Jennings(pty:dft), Attorney Steven H Schwartz added to party Prairie Township Fire Protection District(pty:dft))(Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docket(#8) Before the Court is Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. (Doc. #7). For good cause stated, the motion is granted. Defendants are hereby granted an extension of time until and including March 1, 2021, to file their responsive pleading. Signed on 1/27/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by W. Joseph Hatley on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Mike Boinski(pty:dft), Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Sally Haynes(pty:dft), Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Berry Jennings(pty:dft), Attorney W. Joseph Hatley added to party Prairie Township Fire Protection District(pty:dft))(Hatley, W.) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Zachariah Sierks. Sally Haynes served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Baldwin, C.) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Zachariah Sierks. Berry Jennings served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Baldwin, C.) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Zachariah Sierks. Mike Boinski served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Baldwin, C.) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Zachariah Sierks. Prairie Township Fire Protection District served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Baldwin, C.) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Mike Boinski, Sally Haynes, Berry Jennings, Prairie Township Fire Protection District. Summons emailed to counsel for Plaintiff for service. (Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Prairie Township Fire Protection District filed by Baldwin, C. on behalf of Zachariah Sierks. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7191506. Service due by 3/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baldwin, C.). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less