This case was last updated from PACER on 08/28/2020 at 12:17:27 (UTC).

Siegel & Siegel, P.C. et al v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 Siegel Siegel, P C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04993

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Siegel Law Group, P.C.

Siegel & Siegel, P.C.

Defendant

Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darren T. Kaplan

Attorney at Kaplan Gore LLP

1359 Broadway Suite 2001

New York, NY 10018

Richard Lombardo

Attorney at Shaffer Lombardo Shurin

2001 Wyandotte

Kansas City, MO 64108

Michael Barzee

2001 Wyandotte Street

Kansas City, MO 64108

Defendant Attorneys

Meghan Lorraine Newcomer

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson, LLP (NYC)

1114 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Sarah Gordon

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

1330 Connecticut Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Charles Anthony Michael

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson, LLP (NYC)

1114 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C., Siegel Law Group, P.C.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

31 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A--Insurance Policy

#31

(#31) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Hartford Casualty Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C., Siegel Law Group, P.C.. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A--Insurance Policy).(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

30 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion

30 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A--Certificates of Good Standing

30 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Bradley T. Wilders in Support of Motion

#30

(#30) MOTION for Bradley T. Wilders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21207757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C., Siegel Law Group, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Bradley T. Wilders in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A--Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion).(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

29 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion

29 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A, Certificates of Good Standing

29 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Curtis Shank in Support

#29

(#29) MOTION for Curtis Shank to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21207485. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C., Siegel Law Group, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Curtis Shank in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion).(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#22

(#28) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Sarah D. Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Siegel Law Group, P.C...(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C...(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-03258. Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C., Siegel Law Group, P.C...(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint

#1

(#31) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Hartford Casualty Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C., Siegel Law Group, P.C.. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A--Insurance Policy).(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C., Siegel Law Group, P.C.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #30 Motion for Bradley T. Wilders to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting #29 Motion for Curtis Shank to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Hartford Casualty Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C., Siegel Law Group, P.C.. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A--Insurance Policy).(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Bradley T. Wilders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21207757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION for Bradley T. Wilders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21207757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C., Siegel Law Group, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Bradley T. Wilders in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A--Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion).(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for Curtis Shank to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21207485. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION for Curtis Shank to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21207485. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C., Siegel Law Group, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Curtis Shank in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion).(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Sarah D. Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#27) ORDER. As discussed on the record during the telephone conference held on August 17, 2020, Defendants' motion to dismiss and accompanying papers are due August 19, 2020. Plaintiffs' opposition is due three weeks after service of Defendants' motion. Defendants' reply is due one week after service of Plaintiffs' opposition. Also as discussed on the record during the same telephone conference, discovery is stayed pending the Court's decision on the motion to dismiss. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 7, 2020 is adjourned sine die. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-03258-GHW. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Gregory H. Woods as possibly related to 1:20cv3258. (sj) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(sj) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Darren T. Kaplan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 1 (Citizen of This State). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State). (sj) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Siegel Law Group, P.C...(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C...(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-03258. Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C., Siegel Law Group, P.C...(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-20472756)Document filed by Siegel & Siegel, P.C., Siegel Law Group, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint).(Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN INSURER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darren T. Kaplan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Barzee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard F. Lombardo