This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2021 at 09:14:30 (UTC).

Siefert v. Tire Discounters, Inc

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Siefert filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Tire Discounters, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. McFarland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00630

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. McFarland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Siefert

Defendant

Tire Discounters, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Drew T. Legando

Attorney at Merriman Legando Williams & Klang, LLC

1360 West 9Th Street, Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant Attorneys

Colleen P Lewis

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl - 1

1900 Chemed Center, 255 E 5Th Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Jason Hilliard

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

1900 Chemed Center, 255 East Fifth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Lindsey N Boyd

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

255 East Fifth Street, Suite 1900

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:21-cv-617, 1:21-cv-618, 1:21-cv-619, 1:21-cv-620, 1:21-cv-621, 1:21-cv-627, 1:21-cv-628, 1:21-cv-629, 1:21-cv-616, 1:21-cv-631, 1:21-cv-632, 1:21-cv-633, and 1:21-cv-634 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Matthew W. McFarland for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 10/07/2021. (bjc) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey N Boyd for Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc (Boyd, Lindsey) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Tire Discounters, Inc. (kh) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Certified Mail Receipt Return

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed (Not Effectuated related to COVID19) as to Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc. Tire Discounters, Inc served on 10/18/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (kh) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen P Lewis for Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc (Lewis, Colleen) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Hilliard for Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc (Hilliard, Jason) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Tire Discounters, Inc. (Lewis, Colleen) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc. (Lewis, Colleen) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc. (Lewis, Colleen) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Tire Discounters, Inc. (Lewis, Colleen) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Hilliard for Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc (Hilliard, Jason) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen P Lewis for Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc (Lewis, Colleen) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed (Not Effectuated related to COVID19) as to Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc. Tire Discounters, Inc served on 10/18/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (kh) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kh) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Tire Discounters, Inc. (kh) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey N Boyd for Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc (Boyd, Lindsey) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:21-cv-617, 1:21-cv-618, 1:21-cv-619, 1:21-cv-620, 1:21-cv-621, 1:21-cv-627, 1:21-cv-628, 1:21-cv-629, 1:21-cv-616, 1:21-cv-631, 1:21-cv-632, 1:21-cv-633, and 1:21-cv-634 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Matthew W. McFarland for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 10/07/2021. (bjc) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Plaintiff Joseph Siefert of Related Case (Legando, Drew) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Tire Discounters, Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8519136), filed by Joseph Siefert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Legando, Drew) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tire Discounters, Inc is a litigant