This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2021 at 08:01:25 (UTC).

Sidebottom v. Stryker Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Sidebottom filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Stryker Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Indira Talwani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-11529

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Indira Talwani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Craig Sidebottom

Defendant

Stryker Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Mark Hutchinson

Attorney at Cole, Scott & Kissane, PA

1900 Summit Tower Blvd., Suite 400

Orlando, FL 32810

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Ann McLoone

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

201 South Biscayne Blvdsuite 3200

Miami, FL 33131

Hildy M. Sastre

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

Citigroup Center Suite 3200201 South Biscayne Boulevard

Miami, FL 33131-4332

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket(#16) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: Cancelling November 15, 2021 Case Management Conference. The clerk shall reset the Case Management Conference for December 16, 2021. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(Dore, Samantha) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing: Case Management Conference set for September 28, 2021 is RESET to November 15, 2021 04:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani.Counsel of record: To gain access to the hearing, please register at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. (Counsel shall select "Public" as 'Sign-up Type'. Counsel shall enter Display Name and telephone number, for video access.)This hearing will be conducted by video conference. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Orders No. 1-13, (Attachments: #1 Case Management Orders 1-9, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Order Aiding Private Settlement, #6 Order Extending Discovery)(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number: 63, MDL No. 2768 has been transferred from Middle District of Florida and assigned civil action number: 21-11529. Middle District of Florida case number: 21-1940. In Re: Striker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:21-cv-01940. (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order (CTO-63) transferring case to District of Massachusetts. MDL case number: 2768. (AG) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE to counsel Ryan Mark Hutchinson of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2): -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GSO) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 --Motion for Extension of Time; extending until 9/17/2021 the time within which to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/19/2021. (BK) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal /Complaint by Stryker Corporation. (McLoone, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jennifer A. McLoone on behalf of Stryker Corporation. Lead Counsel: Jennifer A. McLoone. (McLoone, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to counsel Jennifer A. McLoone of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:21-cv-1940-SDM-SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Stryker Corporation. (McLoone, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixth Judicial Circuit, In And For Pinellas County, Florida, case number 21-003470-CI filed in State Court on 07/18/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18584221 filed by Stryker Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal)(McLoone, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STRYKER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hildy M. Sastre

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Ann McLoone