This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:31:36 (UTC).

SIBLEY v. ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 SIBLEY filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY TORRESEN and JOHN H. RICH III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00164

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY TORRESEN

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUDITH SIBLEY

JUDY SIBLEY

Defendant

ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARTHUR J. GREIF

Attorney at GILBERT & GREIF, P.A.

82 Columbia Street, P.O. Box 2339, 947-2223

Bangor, ME 04402-2339

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL P. SCHWARZ

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS LLP

100 International Drive, Suite 363

Portsmouth, NH 03801

 

Court Documents

9 #6

summary sheet

9 #7

notice of filing of ntc of removal with exhibits

#9

(#9) STATE COURT RECORD by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC. Main Document: Penobscot County Superior Court Docket Record (Attachments: #1 Notice of appearance, #2 notice of filing of notice of removal to state court, #3 notice of filing of removal, #4 state court complaint, #5 summons, #6 summary sheet, #7 notice of filing of ntc of removal with exhibits)(SCHWARZ, DANIEL) Modified on 4/24/2019 to add description of Main Document (mnw). (Entered: 04/24/2019)

9 #2

notice of filing of notice of removal to state court

9 #1

Notice of appearance

#11

(#11) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC re #9 State Court Record, . Main Document: Penobscot County Superior Court Docket Record and Summons Return (SCHWARZ, DANIEL) Modified on 4/26/2019 to clean up description of main document (mnw). (Entered: 04/26/2019)

9 #3

notice of filing of removal

9 #4

state court complaint

9 #5

summons

#10

(#10) Affidavit of Daniel Schwarz in Support of Filing State Court Record. (SCHWARZ, DANIEL) Modified on 4/24/2019 to clean up the docket text (mjlt). (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/9/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 9/16/2019. Motions due by 9/30/2019. Ready for Trial on 12/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#7

(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC.(SCHWARZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JUDITH SIBLEY. (GREIF, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC. (SCHWARZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#4

(#4) PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 4/24/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL (bfa) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

1 #4

notice of filing removal to State Court

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC re #9 State Court Record, . Main Document: Penobscot County Superior Court Docket Record and Summons Return (SCHWARZ, DANIEL) Modified on 4/26/2019 to clean up description of main document (mnw). (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Affidavit of Daniel Schwarz in Support of Filing State Court Record. (SCHWARZ, DANIEL) Modified on 4/24/2019 to clean up the docket text (mjlt). (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STATE COURT RECORD by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC. Main Document: Penobscot County Superior Court Docket Record (Attachments: #1 Notice of appearance, #2 notice of filing of notice of removal to state court, #3 notice of filing of removal, #4 state court complaint, #5 summons, #6 summary sheet, #7 notice of filing of ntc of removal with exhibits)(SCHWARZ, DANIEL) Modified on 4/24/2019 to add description of Main Document (mnw). (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/9/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 9/16/2019. Motions due by 9/30/2019. Ready for Trial on 12/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC.(SCHWARZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JUDITH SIBLEY. (GREIF, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC. (SCHWARZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2006959.), filed by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC.(SCHWARZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/29/2019. (bfa) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 4/24/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Set Answer Deadline for ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INCORPORATED : Answer due by 4/23/2019. (bfa) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL (bfa) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Penobscot County Superior Court, case number CV-2019-46. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC. (Service of Process Deadline 7/15/2019) Fee due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 summary sheet, #2 complaint, #3 summons, #4 notice of filing removal to State Court)(bfa) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.