This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 12:37:41 (UTC).

Siarah Hwy 138, LLC v. Selective Way Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 Siarah Hwy 138, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Selective Way Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01499

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Siarah Hwy 138, LLC

Siarah Hwy 138, LLC doing business as Texaco

Defendants

Selective Insurance Company of America

Selective Way Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Davis Turner

Attorney at Huggins Law Firm, LLC

110 Norcross Street

Roswell, GA 30075

J. Remington Huggins

Attorney at Huggins Law Firm, LLC

110 Norcross Street

Roswell, GA 30075

Defendant Attorney

Gregory R. Crochet

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP

Suite 2750, 303 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30308-3201

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Crochet, Gregory) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER re: #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to a six-month discovery track. Discovery ends on 11/16/2020. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 5/11/2020. (jta) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#9

(#9) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Crochet, Gregory) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#8

(#8) SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Persons by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Crochet, Gregory) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Substitute Party. Selective Way Insurance Company is hereby added in place of and substituted for Selective Insurance Company of America, as the Defendant herein, and Selective Insurance Company of America is hereby DISMISSED as a party Defendant. The caption of this action shall be changed accordingly. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/24/20. (bjh) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant Selective Insurance Company of Americaby Siarah Hwy 138, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selective Insurance Company of America. Discovery ends on 9/14/2020.(Crochet, Gregory) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/8/2019. (bgt) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit -E -Affidavit of Gregory Crochet

1 #4

Exhibit -D -Notice of Appearance

1 #3

Exhibit -C -Certificate of Service

1 #2

Exhibit -B -Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit -A -Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9577661) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Summons, #2 Exhibit -B -Complaint, #3 Exhibit -C -Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit -D -Notice of Appearance, #5 Exhibit -E -Affidavit of Gregory Crochet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/09/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Crochet, Gregory) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER re: #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to a six-month discovery track. Discovery ends on 11/16/2020. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 5/11/2020. (jta) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Crochet, Gregory) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Persons by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Crochet, Gregory) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Substitute Party. Selective Way Insurance Company is hereby added in place of and substituted for Selective Insurance Company of America, as the Defendant herein, and Selective Insurance Company of America is hereby DISMISSED as a party Defendant. The caption of this action shall be changed accordingly. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/24/20. (bjh) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant Selective Insurance Company of Americaby Siarah Hwy 138, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selective Insurance Company of America. Discovery ends on 9/14/2020.(Crochet, Gregory) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/8/2019. (bgt) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (eop) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9577661) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Summons, #2 Exhibit -B -Complaint, #3 Exhibit -C -Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit -D -Notice of Appearance, #5 Exhibit -E -Affidavit of Gregory Crochet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Way Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Selective Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory R. Crochet