This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:27:50 (UTC).

Shun Trayon Hill v. H. B. Anglea

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Shun Trayon Hill filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against H B Anglea. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kandis A. Westmore and PSLC RMH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00075

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

Referral Judge

PSLC RMH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shun Trayon Hill

Jamestown, CA 95327

Respondent

H. B. Anglea

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a Magistrate Judge. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shun Trayon Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth transferring case to Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (et) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/10/2020. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE regarding case transferred in from Central District of California. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shun Trayon Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Shun Trayon Hill. (lh) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#2

(#2) ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Shun Trayon Hill. (lh) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

3 #1

CV-111

7 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

10 #1

Envelope

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shun Trayon Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shun Trayon Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a Magistrate Judge. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE regarding case transferred in from Central District of California. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/10/2020. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-10790. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 1/6/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth transferring case to Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (et) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Shun Trayon Hill. (lh) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Shun Trayon Hill. (lh) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.