This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/28/2019 at 08:06:22 (UTC).

Shumate v. Waitr Incorporated, et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 Shumate filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Waitr Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Troy L. Nunley and Kendall J. Newman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00986

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jon Shumate

Defendants

Waitr Incorporated

Chris Meaux

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Navid Soleymani

Attorney at Yadegar Minoofar

1875 Century Park East, Suite 1240

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Navid Yadegar

Attorney at Yadegar Minoofar & Soleymani LLP

1875 Century Park E., Suite 1240

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica L. Linehan

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney LLP

600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 2000

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Vernle C. Durocher, PHV

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney LLP

50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Andrew B. Brantingham, PHV

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney LLP

50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Nathan Januschka Ebnet, PHV

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney LLP

50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated. (Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Navid Yadegar on behalf of Jon Shumate. Attorney Yadegar, Navid added. (Yadegar, Navid) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Errata to correct the exhibits to the complaint by Jon Shumate. (Soleymani, Navid) Modified on 7/10/2019 (Reader, L). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#11

(#11) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/12/19. Added attorney Nathan Januschka Ebnet, PHV for Chris Meaux and Waitr Incorporated. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#10

(#10) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/12/19. Added attorney Vernle C. Durocher, PHV for Chris Meaux and Waitr Incorporated. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#9

(#9) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/12/19. Added attorney Andrew B. Brantingham, PHV for Chris Meaux and Waitr Incorporated. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#8

(#8) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated for attorney Nathan Januschka Ebnet to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-8308119) (Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#7

(#7) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated for attorney Andrew B. Brantingham to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-8308092) (Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#6

(#6) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated for attorney Vernle C. Durocher, Jr. to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-8308065) (Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated. (Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated.(Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Removal of Action by Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated. (Linehan, Jessica) Modified on 6/4/2019 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 06/03/2019)

2 #2

VDRP

2 #1

Consent Form

#2

(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Washington, S) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

1 #2

Declaration of Jessica L. Linehan

1 #1

Appendix of State Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Placer County Superior Court, case number S-CV-0042887 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8286474) (Attachments: #1 Appendix of State Court Pleadings, #2 Declaration of Jessica L. Linehan, #3 Declaration of Chris Meaux, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons)(Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated. (Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Navid Yadegar on behalf of Jon Shumate. Attorney Yadegar, Navid added. (Yadegar, Navid) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Errata to correct the exhibits to the complaint by Jon Shumate. (Soleymani, Navid) Modified on 7/10/2019 (Reader, L). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/12/19. Added attorney Nathan Januschka Ebnet, PHV for Chris Meaux and Waitr Incorporated. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/12/19. Added attorney Vernle C. Durocher, PHV for Chris Meaux and Waitr Incorporated. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/12/19. Added attorney Andrew B. Brantingham, PHV for Chris Meaux and Waitr Incorporated. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated for attorney Nathan Januschka Ebnet to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-8308119) (Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated for attorney Andrew B. Brantingham to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-8308092) (Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated for attorney Vernle C. Durocher, Jr. to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-8308065) (Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated. (Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated.(Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Removal of Action by Chris Meaux, Waitr Incorporated. (Linehan, Jessica) Modified on 6/4/2019 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Washington, S) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Placer County Superior Court, case number S-CV-0042887 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8286474) (Attachments: #1 Appendix of State Court Pleadings, #2 Declaration of Jessica L. Linehan, #3 Declaration of Chris Meaux, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons)(Linehan, Jessica) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Waitr Inc is a litigant