This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 06:31:44 (UTC).

Shultz v. Citibank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 Shultz filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Citibank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Willie J. Epps, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04056

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Willie J. Epps, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Shultz

Defendants

Citibank, N.A.

Citicorp LLC

Citigroup Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brooke Amos Davids

Attorney at TGH Litigation LLC

28 N. 8Th Street, Suite 317

Columbia, MO 65201

Julianne O'Bannon Germinder

Attorney at TGH Litigation LLC

28 N. 8Th Street, Suite 317

Columbia, MO 65201

J Andrew Hirth

Attorney at TGH Litigation LLC

28 N. 8Th Street, Suite 317

Columbia, MO 65201

Defendant Attorney

Eric A. Todd

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak, & Stewart, P.C.

7700 Bonhomme Avenue, Suite 650

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #7 motion to compel arbitration and stay proceedings. Signed on 5/28/2022 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Moore, Kaitlin) (Entered: 05/28/2022)

#19

(#19) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #7 MOTION to compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings Surreply filed by J Andrew Hirth on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Shultz. Reply suggestions due by 6/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Hirth, J Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

17 #1

Exhibit Proposed Surreply

17 #17

Main Document

#15

(#15) MOTION to amend/correct by Interlineation filed by Brooke Amos Davids on behalf of Scott Shultz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/3/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Davids, Brooke) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#14

(#14) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #7 MOTION to compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Eric A. Todd on behalf of Defendant Citibank, N.A.. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#13

(#13) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #7 MOTION to compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by J Andrew Hirth on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Shultz. Reply suggestions due by 5/19/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Hirth, J Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#12

(#12) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/3/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 6/12/2022. The parties must follow the formatting of Judge Epps' example scheduling and trial order posted at https://www.mow.uscourts.gov/judges/epps. Signed on 5/5/2022 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Moore, Kaitlin) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#13) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #7 MOTION to compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by J Andrew Hirth on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Shultz. Reply suggestions due by 5/19/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Hirth, J Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

5 #1

MAP General Order

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) NOTICE of filing of Notice of Removal by Citibank, N.A. (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Eric A. Todd on behalf of Defendant Citibank, N.A..(Todd, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of appearance by Eric A. Todd on behalf of Citibank, N.A. (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court File

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #7 motion to compel arbitration and stay proceedings. Signed on 5/28/2022 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Moore, Kaitlin) (Entered: 05/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #7 MOTION to compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings Surreply filed by J Andrew Hirth on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Shultz. Reply suggestions due by 6/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Hirth, J Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration. Plaintiff is granted leave to file the proposed surreply [17-1] as a separate and independent electronic docket entry on or before March 31, 2022. Signed on 5/24/2022 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Kaitlin) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for leave to file Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by J Andrew Hirth on behalf of Scott Shultz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Surreply)(Hirth, J Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 motion to amend/correct complaint by interlineation. Without objection from the Defendant, Citibank/Citicorp/Citigroup Inc. is amended by interlineation to Citibank, N.A. Signed on 5/23/2022 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Kaitlin) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to amend/correct by Interlineation filed by Brooke Amos Davids on behalf of Scott Shultz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/3/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Davids, Brooke) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #7 MOTION to compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Eric A. Todd on behalf of Defendant Citibank, N.A.. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #7 MOTION to compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by J Andrew Hirth on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Shultz. Reply suggestions due by 5/19/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Hirth, J Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/3/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 6/12/2022. The parties must follow the formatting of Judge Epps' example scheduling and trial order posted at https://www.mow.uscourts.gov/judges/epps. Signed on 5/5/2022 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Moore, Kaitlin) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of filing Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal by Citibank, N.A. (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUGGESTIONS in support re #7 MOTION to compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Eric A. Todd on behalf of Defendant Citibank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Eric A. Todd on behalf of Citibank, N.A.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/5/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Docket(#6) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 4/14/2022 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Kaitlin) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff and defendant: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 5/5/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of filing of Notice of Removal by Citibank, N.A. (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Eric A. Todd on behalf of Defendant Citibank, N.A..(Todd, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of appearance by Eric A. Todd on behalf of Citibank, N.A. (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Camden County, case number 22CM-CC00015, filed by Eric A. Todd. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7888143. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Exhibit A - State Court File)(Todd, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citicorp is a litigant

Latest cases where Citigroup Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A. Hirth(Designation Retained)