Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 13:46:43 (UTC).

Shukla v. Apple Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Shukla filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesse M. Furman and Stewart D. Aaron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03287

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesse M. Furman

Referral Judge

Stewart D. Aaron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashu Shukla

Princeton, NJ 08540

Defendants

Apple Inc.

Deloitte Consulting LLP

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If the parties consent to having the Magistrate Judge decide the case, the Magistrate Judge replaces the District Judge, thereby speeding up the resolution of the case (because only one judge instead of two will be involved in the case). Any appeal from a Magistrate Judges decision following consent is directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit in the same way that an appeal from a District Judges decision would be taken. By contrast, if the parties do not consent to having the Magistrate Judge decide the case, the Magistrate Judge will first issue a Report and Recommendation, and the District Judge will then consider any objections either party has to the Report and Recommendation before a final judgment is entered, at which point an appeal to the Second Circuit could be taken. The parties may consider consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge both in this case and in Shukla v. Deloitte Consulting LLP, No. 19-CV-10578 (AJN) (SDA), given Magistrate Judge Aaron's familiarity with the issues raised in both cases. The Clerk of Court is directed to electronically notify Plaintiff of this order by transmitting it to Plaintiff's email address, ashu.shukla@gmail.com. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/27/21) (yv) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#17

(#17) ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, paid the filing fees to commence this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses as to Defendants Apple, Inc., and Deloitte Consulting, LLP. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on each Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summonses. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendants or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendants under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to electronically notify Plaintiff of this order by transmitting it to Plaintiff's email address, ashu.shukla@gmail.com. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/27/2021) (mml) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#4

Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Ashu Shukla at 202 Salem CT, Apt. 11, Princeton, NJ 08540. (dsh) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#26

(#26) MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ON THE CASE PURS. TO THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE & LOCAL RULES, re: #24 MOTION to Disqualify Judge. Document filed by Ashu Shukla. (sc) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#21

(#21) INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Ashu Shukla, at 202 Salem CT, Apt. 11, Princeton, NJ 08540, on 5/27/2021 Re: #17 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 2 copies of Summons(es) mailed. (sha) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#20

(#20) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deloitte Consulting LLP. (sha) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#19

(#19) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Apple Inc.. (sha) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#18

(#18) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/27/21) (yv) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#6

(#6) MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, re: for Permission for Ashu Shukla to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Ashu Shukla.(sc) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Apple Inc., Deloitte Consulting LLP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ashu Shukla. (sac) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ON THE CASE PURS. TO THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE & LOCAL RULES, re: #24 MOTION to Disqualify Judge. Document filed by Ashu Shukla. (sc) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DECLARATION of Ashu Shukla in Support re: #24 MOTION to Disqualify Magistrate Judge. Document filed by Ashu Shukla. (sc) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF MOTION, re: to Disqualify the Magistrate Judge on this case. Document filed by Ashu Shukla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Certificate of Service)(sc) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from A. Shukla, dated 6/7/21 re: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AARON FROM THE CASE; PLAINTIFF'S PENDING MOTIONS ON THIS COURT - INCLUDING THE CHANGE OF FILING DATE ON THIS CASE; DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP HAS PREVIOUSLY INFLUENCED COURT PERSONNEL TO MALICIOUSLY DENY PLAINTIFF'S VALID CLAIMS;. Document filed by Ashu Shukla.(sc) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If the parties consent to having the Magistrate Judge decide the case, the Magistrate Judge replaces the District Judge, thereby speeding up the resolution of the case (because only one judge instead of two will be involved in the case). Any appeal from a Magistrate Judges decision following consent is directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit in the same way that an appeal from a District Judges decision would be taken. By contrast, if the parties do not consent to having the Magistrate Judge decide the case, the Magistrate Judge will first issue a Report and Recommendation, and the District Judge will then consider any objections either party has to the Report and Recommendation before a final judgment is entered, at which point an appeal to the Second Circuit could be taken. The parties may consider consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge both in this case and in Shukla v. Deloitte Consulting LLP, No. 19-CV-10578 (AJN) (SDA), given Magistrate Judge Aaron's familiarity with the issues raised in both cases. The Clerk of Court is directed to electronically notify Plaintiff of this order by transmitting it to Plaintiff's email address, ashu.shukla@gmail.com. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/27/21) (yv) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Ashu Shukla, at 202 Salem CT, Apt. 11, Princeton, NJ 08540, on 5/27/2021 Re: #17 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 2 copies of Summons(es) mailed. (sha) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deloitte Consulting LLP. (sha) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Apple Inc.. (sha) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/27/21) (yv) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, paid the filing fees to commence this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses as to Defendants Apple, Inc., and Deloitte Consulting, LLP. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on each Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summonses. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendants or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendants under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to electronically notify Plaintiff of this order by transmitting it to Plaintiff's email address, ashu.shukla@gmail.com. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/27/2021) (mml) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION, re: to Change the Date of Filing of Plaintiff's Complaint & Summons etc. Document filed by Ashu Shukla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Certificate of Service)(sc) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, re: for Permission for Ashu Shukla to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Ashu Shukla.(sc) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: A. Shukla consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Ashu Shukla.(sc) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Ashu Shukla at 202 Salem CT, Apt. 11, Princeton, NJ 08540. (dsh) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE BALANCE: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the $2.00 filing fee balance to the Cashier within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. The Cashiers Unit shall hold Plaintiffs $400.00 certified check for 30 days from the date of this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 5/17/2021. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/16/2021) (keb) Transmission to Civil Case Openings Clerk for processing. Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing. (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Apple Inc., Deloitte Consulting LLP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ashu Shukla. (sac) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., Deloitte Consulting LLP. Document filed by Ashu Shukla. (sac) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deloitte Consulting LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant