This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2021 at 07:40:41 (UTC).

In re Ex Parte Application of Shueisha Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 In re Ex Parte Application of Shueisha Inc was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia K. DeMarchi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-MC-80255

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shueisha Inc.

Defendants

Google LLC

Hurricane Electric LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Junji Suzuki

Attorney at Marshall Suzuki Law Group, LLP.

230 California Street, Suite 415

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) EX PARTE APPLICATION of Shueisha Inc. for Order pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 Permitting Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceeding and Memorandum against Hurricane Electric LLC, Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number ACANDC-16560045.). Filed by Shueisha Inc.. (Suzuki, Junji) (Filed on 10/27/2021) Modified on 11/5/2021 (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#2

(#2) Declaration of Junji Suzuki in Support of #1 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening), filed byShueisha Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Suzuki, Junji) (Filed on 10/27/2021) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#3

(#3) Declaration of Hiroyuki Nakajima in Support of #1 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening), filed byShueisha Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Suzuki, Junji) (Filed on 10/27/2021) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#4

(#4) Declaration of Da Lin Liao in Support of #1 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening), filed byShueisha Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Suzuki, Junji) (Filed on 10/27/2021) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Shueisha Inc. re #1 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening), (Suzuki, Junji) (Filed on 10/27/2021) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Proposed Subpoena to Google LLC

6 #2

Proposed Subpoena to Hurricane Electric LLC

#8

(#8) Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #1 Ex Parte Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #1 Ex Parte Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Order re #1 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening), by Shueisha Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Subpoena to Google LLC, #2 Proposed Subpoena to Hurricane Electric LLC)(Suzuki, Junji) (Filed on 10/27/2021) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Shueisha Inc. re #1 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening), (Suzuki, Junji) (Filed on 10/27/2021) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration of Da Lin Liao in Support of #1 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening), filed byShueisha Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Suzuki, Junji) (Filed on 10/27/2021) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Declaration of Hiroyuki Nakajima in Support of #1 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening), filed byShueisha Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Suzuki, Junji) (Filed on 10/27/2021) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration of Junji Suzuki in Support of #1 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening), filed byShueisha Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Suzuki, Junji) (Filed on 10/27/2021) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) EX PARTE APPLICATION of Shueisha Inc. for Order pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 Permitting Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceeding and Memorandum against Hurricane Electric LLC, Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number ACANDC-16560045.). Filed by Shueisha Inc.. (Suzuki, Junji) (Filed on 10/27/2021) Modified on 11/5/2021 (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shueisha Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Junji Suzuki