This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:58:41 (UTC).

Shuckra v. United States

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Shuckra filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor A. Bolden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01923

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victor A. Bolden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Shuckra

Hartford, CT 06114

Defendants

Community Health Services, Inc.

Randy P. McKenney

United States

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Eric Benjamin Miller

Attorney at Department of Justice

157 Church Street, 24Th Floor

New Haven, CT 06510

 

Court Documents

4 #2

Exhibit 1 (Decl. of Meredith Torres)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/6/19.(Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 12/9/2019 as to filing date. (Imbriani, Susan). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2020; Discovery due by 6/9/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/19.(Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 12/9/2019 as to filing date.(Imbriani, Susan). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

4 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

9 #1

Standing order on Removed Cases

#3

(#3) MOTION for Notice of Substitution of United States as Defendant and Motion to Amend Caption Order by Community Health Services, Inc., Randy P. McKenney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Decl. of Meredith Torres))(Miller, Eric) Modified text to update parties on 12/6/2019 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 (Certification of Scope of Employment)

#8

(#8) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/6/19.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Benjamin Miller on behalf of Community Health Services, Inc., Randy P. McKenney (Miller, Eric) Modified text to update parties on on 12/6/2019 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit 1 (Decl. of Meredith Torres)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Randy P. McKenney, Community Health Services, Inc. from Superior Court Judicial District of Hartford, case number HHD-CV19-5059993-S., filed by Randy McKenney, Community Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Pleadings), #2 Exhibit 2 (Certification of Scope of Employment))(Miller, Eric) Modified text to update parties on 12/6/2019 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Community Health Services, Inc., Randy P. McKenney re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Notice to Pro Se Litigant (Miller, Eric) Modified text to update parties on 12/6/2019 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Community Health Services, Inc., Randy P. McKenney. Responses due by 12/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 (Decl. of Meredith Torres))(Miller, Eric) Modified text to update parties on 12/6/2019 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 (State Court Pleadings)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion for Order to Stay Discovery and Postpone Rule 26 Requirements. The Court orders that Rule 26 requirements be postponed until thirty (30) days after the Court rules on the pending motion to dismiss. The deadline for filing the parties' joint 26(f) conference report will be set for fourteen (14) days following the parties' Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/27/2019. (Conde, Djenab) Modified on 12/27/2019 to correct date of signature (Perez, J.). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Notice of Substitution of United States as Defendant and Motion to Amend Caption Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to substitute the United States of America as the defendant in place of the current named defendants, Community Health Services, Inc. and Randy P. McKenney. The Clerk of Court is also directed to amend the case caption accordingly so that the only Defendant in this case is the United States. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/27/2019. (Conde, Djenab) Modified on 12/27/2019 to correct date of signature (Perez, J.). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Order to Stay Discovery and Postpone Rule 26 Requirements Order by Community Health Services, Inc., Randy P. McKenney. (Miller, Eric) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 MOTION for Notice of Substitution of United States as Defendant and Motion to Amend Caption Order filed by Community Health Services, Inc., #5 Notice (Other), #7 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Community Health Services, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Community Health Services, Inc., #4 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Standing order on Removed Cases)(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/6/19.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/6/19.(Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 12/9/2019 as to filing date. (Imbriani, Susan). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2020; Discovery due by 6/9/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/19.(Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 12/9/2019 as to filing date.(Imbriani, Susan). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge Victor A. Bolden added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Community Health Services, Inc., Randy P. McKenney re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Notice to Pro Se Litigant (Miller, Eric) Modified text to update parties on 12/6/2019 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Community Health Services, Inc., Randy P. McKenney. Responses due by 12/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 (Decl. of Meredith Torres))(Miller, Eric) Modified text to update parties on 12/6/2019 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Notice of Substitution of United States as Defendant and Motion to Amend Caption Order by Community Health Services, Inc., Randy P. McKenney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Decl. of Meredith Torres))(Miller, Eric) Modified text to update parties on 12/6/2019 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Benjamin Miller on behalf of Community Health Services, Inc., Randy P. McKenney (Miller, Eric) Modified text to update parties on on 12/6/2019 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Randy P. McKenney, Community Health Services, Inc. from Superior Court Judicial District of Hartford, case number HHD-CV19-5059993-S., filed by Randy McKenney, Community Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Pleadings), #2 Exhibit 2 (Certification of Scope of Employment))(Miller, Eric) Modified text to update parties on 12/6/2019 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.