This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:24:58 (UTC).

SHROFF et al v. CUCCINELLI

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SHROFF filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against CUCCINELLI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher R. Cooper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03643

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher R. Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POORNIMA LAXMINARAYANAN

ANDREA SHIRLEY MICHEAL RAJ

RAMU MIRIAMPALLI

AKRITI MAHAJAN

MANSI RAJIV PANT

SAMHITHA KANDI

AMULYA SREEDHARAM

ANITHA REDDY MADAM

SUJILATHA DAMODHARAN

ANJALI TIWARI

SUSHMA DASARRAJU

BRINDA ADAYAPALAM RAMAMURTHY

KAVYAA VENKATACHALAM

SANDHYA KULKARNI

SHARMILA BHATTACHARYA

DIVYA RAVI

SOUJANYA NOMULA

SUMANTH KUMAR PANGULURI

KALI KISHNA KUMARI DEVINENI

SREERUPA GANGULY

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven A. Brown

Attorney at REDDY & NEUMANN, P.C.

11000 Richmond Ave, Suite 600

Houston, TX 77042

Other Attorneys

Johnny Hillary Walker, III

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI served on 12/10/2019 (Brown, Steven) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6625008) filed by ANJU SINGH, SRI PRANAVI POPURI, KARTHIK KONDRAGUNTA, SUMANTH KUMAR PANGULURI, REMYA NEDIYAPPARAMBU SANKAR, RAMU MIRIAMPALLI, SOUMYA MADIRAJU, RAJNI TAPAN SHROFF, BHARTI BAJAJ, SOUJANYA NOMULA, MANSI RAJIV PANT, BRINDA ADAYAPALAM RAMAMURTHY, PALLAVI MULE, KALI KISHNA KUMARI DEVINENI, CHAITALI BAL, VIJAYAKUMARI YESHHMALA, SUJILATHA DAMODHARAN, AYYANNA CHOWDARY JAGARLAMUDI, SAMHITHA KANDI, SOUMYA VALLAP, VINDHYA REDDY DANDA, ANUSHA SATHI, NITHYA MADURAIPILLAI, REVANTH CHITTOOR, PRIYANKA REDDY DANDA, KRANTHI VEERAVALLI, SUSHMA DASARRAJU, EKTA MAHESHWARI, KAVYAA VENKATACHALAM, NEHA RAPELLY, JYOTSNA THANKUR, POORNIMA LAXMINARAYANAN, SHARMILA BHATTACHARYA, VIBHAVARI SAINATH SAIL, RITIKA BHAOTANKAR, SATHIYAPRIYA MALAIAPPAN, NAGA BHARGAVI KOVURU, AKRITI MAHAJAN, KRITI TARA, KAVITA RANA, SREERUPA GANGULY, SHALINI DUA, SUPRIYA UPRETI, ANJALI TIWARI, DIVYA RAVI, ANDREA SHIRLEY MICHEAL RAJ, ANUSHA THIPPANA, SANDHYA KULKARNI, ANITHA REDDY MADAM, VASAVIPRAVALLIKA AYTHA, BALA SAI SWARUP BHATTIPROLU, AMULYA SREEDHARAM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Request USAO, #3 Summons Summons Request USAG, #4 Summons Summons Request DHSGC)(Brown, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less