This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2021 at 13:00:20 (UTC).

Shrader v. CSA Travel Protection et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Shrader filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CSA Travel Protection. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allison H. Goddard and William Q. Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02522

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Allison H. Goddard

Presiding Judge

William Q. Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kathleen A. Shrader

Defendants

Generali Global Assistance

DOES 1 through 10

CSA Travel Protection

Customized Services Administrators, Inc

Generali Global Assistance doing business as CSA Travel Protection

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A Miller

Attorney at Law Office of David A Miller

555 West Beech Street, Suite 413

San Diego, CA 92101

David A. Miller

Attorney at Law Office of David A. Miller

555 West Beech Street, Suite 451

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Travis Jang-Busby

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

101 West Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference Via Videoconference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 5/7/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, the Court will immediately thereafter hold a Case Management Conference ("CMC") pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 16(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/25/2021.(ag) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSA Travel Protection, Customized Services Administrators, Inc, Generali Global Assistance. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

1 #2

Declaration State Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15127419.), filed by CSA Travel Protection, Generali Global Assistance, Customized Services Administrators, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration State Court Documents)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2522-WQH-AHG. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference Via Videoconference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 5/7/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, the Court will immediately thereafter hold a Case Management Conference ("CMC") pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 16(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/25/2021.(ag) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by CSA Travel Protection, Customized Services Administrators, Inc, Generali Global Assistance. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jang-Busby, Travis) (ag). (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FEDERAL COURT CONFIRMING NOTIFICATION TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL by CSA Travel Protection, Customized Services Administrators, Inc, Generali Global Assistance re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jang-Busby, Travis) (ag). (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSA Travel Protection, Customized Services Administrators, Inc, Generali Global Assistance. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15127419.), filed by CSA Travel Protection, Generali Global Assistance, Customized Services Administrators, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration State Court Documents)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2522-WQH-AHG. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Generali Global Assistance, Inc. doing business as CSA Travel Protection and Insurance Services doing business as Europ Assistance USA, Inc. doing business as Generali Warranty Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Customized Services Administrators, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Miller(Designation Retained)