This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2022 at 08:41:36 (UTC).

Shortridge et al v. Centrus Energy Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 Shortridge filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Centrus Energy Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Algenon L. Marbley and Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05336

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Algenon L. Marbley

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Danny Shortridge

Craig Moore

Brenda Patton

Doug McLaughlin

Gary Entler

Dockie Tackett

Christine Buttermore

Defendants

Centrus Energy Corp.

Fluor-BWXT Portsmouth, LLC

Mid-America Conversion Services, LLC

Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas W Connors

Attorney at The Law Offices of Warner Mendenhall

190 North Union Street, Suite 201

Akron, OH 44304

Warner Mendenhall

Attorney at The Law Offices of Warner Mendenhall, Inc.

190 N. Union St., Suite 201

Akron, OH 44304

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Donovan Schuster

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease

Po Box 1008, 52 E Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43216-1008

Alycia N Broz

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease LLP

52 East Gay Street, P.O. Box 1008

Columbus, OH 43216-1008

Jacob D. Mahle

301 E. 4Th St., Suite 3500, Great American Tower

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Wesley Abrams

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP

301 E. Fourth Street, Suite 3500

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Melissa G. Foster Bird

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough

949 Third Avenue, Ste 200

Huntington, WV 25701

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Insufficient Service of Process filed by Defendants Fluor-BWXT Portsmouth, LLC, Mid-America Conversion Services, LLC. (Schuster, Richard) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#29

(#29) MOTION to Dismiss Buttermore claim without prejudice by Plaintiff Christine Buttermore. (Mendenhall, Warner) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

20 #6

Exhibit 6 - Mod 359

20 #5

Exhibit 5 - Mod 163

20 #4

Exhibit 4 - Mod 362

20 #3

Exhibit 3 - Mod 166

20 #2

Exhibit 2 - Mod 360

20 #1

Exhibit 1 - Mod 162

20 #20

Main Document

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Plaintiffs Christine Buttermore, Gary Entler, Doug McLaughlin, Craig Moore, Brenda Patton, Danny Shortridge, Dockie Tackett re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed Proposed Order (Mendenhall, Warner) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#2

(#9) ORDER DENYING #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/17/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 331 - Columbus before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley.. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/22/2021. (cw) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

1 #6

Exhibit Shortridge Appeal Email

1 #5

Exhibit Email Exchange Shortridge

1 #4

Exhibit Late Exemption Denial

1 #3

Exhibit Late Exemption Denial

1 #2

Exhibit Award and Incentive Fee 2

1 #1

Exhibit Award and Incentive Fee

1 #1

Main Document

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Insufficient Service of Process filed by Defendants Fluor-BWXT Portsmouth, LLC, Mid-America Conversion Services, LLC. (Schuster, Richard) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION to Dismiss Buttermore claim without prejudice by Plaintiff Christine Buttermore. (Mendenhall, Warner) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Insufficient Service of Process filed by Plaintiffs Christine Buttermore, Craig Moore, Brenda Patton, Dockie Tackett. (Mendenhall, Warner) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 1/3/2022. Replies due by 1/10/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/29/2021. (sw) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 1/3/2022. by Plaintiffs Christine Buttermore, Gary Entler, Doug McLaughlin, Craig Moore, Brenda Patton, Danny Shortridge, Dockie Tackett. (Mendenhall, Warner) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Insufficient Service of Process, #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Replies due by 1/5/2022. (jlk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Oral Request to STAY; DENYING as moot #23 Defendant Motion to Stay. The Preliminary Injunction Hearing is STAYED, until such time as Plaintiff Patton completes her union grievance process. Briefing on Defendants two Motions to Dismiss will continue; Response due 12/27/2021 and Reply Due on 1/5/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/13/2021. (cw) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Stay by Defendants Fluor-BWXT Portsmouth, LLC, Mid-America Conversion Services, LLC. (Schuster, Richard) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Mid-America Conversion Services, LLC. (Schuster, Richard) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Insufficient Service of Process by Defendants Fluor-BWXT Portsmouth, LLC, Mid-America Conversion Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mod 162, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mod 360, #3 Exhibit 3 - Mod 166, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mod 362, #5 Exhibit 5 - Mod 163, #6 Exhibit 6 - Mod 359) (Schuster, Richard) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Alycia N Broz for Defendants Centrus Energy Corp., Fluor-BWXT Portsmouth, LLC, Mid-America Conversion Services, LLC (Broz, Alycia) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER DENYING #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/17/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 331 - Columbus before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley.. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/22/2021. (cw) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa G. Foster Bird for Defendant Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC (Foster Bird, Melissa) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed filed by Defendants Centrus Energy Corp., Fluor-BWXT Portsmouth, LLC, Mid-America Conversion Services, LLC. (Schuster, Richard) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendants Centrus Energy Corp., Fluor-BWXT Portsmouth, LLC, Mid-America Conversion Services, LLC (Abrams, Wesley) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob D. Mahle for Defendants Centrus Energy Corp., Fluor-BWXT Portsmouth, LLC, Mid-America Conversion Services, LLC (Mahle, Jacob) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AOHSDC-8597459 (jlk) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Plaintiffs Christine Buttermore, Gary Entler, Doug McLaughlin, Craig Moore, Brenda Patton, Danny Shortridge, Dockie Tackett re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed Proposed Order (Mendenhall, Warner) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Christine Buttermore, Gary Entler, Doug McLaughlin, Craig Moore, Brenda Patton, Danny Shortridge, Dockie Tackett. (Mendenhall, Warner) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed against Centrus Energy Corp., filed by Danny Shortridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Award and Incentive Fee, #2 Exhibit Award and Incentive Fee 2, #3 Exhibit Late Exemption Denial, #4 Exhibit Late Exemption Denial, #5 Exhibit Email Exchange Shortridge, #6 Exhibit Shortridge Appeal Email) (Mendenhall, Warner) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLUOR-BWXT PORTSMOUTH, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Centrus Energy Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alycia N. Broz