Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2019 at 07:22:22 (UTC).

Shorter v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 Shorter filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are David T. Schultz and Joan N. Ericksen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-00353

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

Presiding Judge

Joan N. Ericksen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles M. Shorter

Defendants

3M Company

Arizant Healthcare, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard S Lewis

Attorney at Hausfeld LLP

1700 K St Nw Ste 650

Washington, DC 20006

Leslie W O'Leary

Attorney at Johnson Johnson Lucas & Middleton, P.C.

975 Oak St, Ste 1050

Eugene, OR 97223

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles M. Shorter. Arizant Healthcare, Inc. served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service)(Lewis, Richard) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles M. Shorter. 3M Company served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service)(Lewis, Richard) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#14

(#14) Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (MMP) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#13

(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. filed by Charles M. Shorter. Filer requests summons issued. (Lewis, Richard) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Short Form Complaint [ECF No. #10 ] is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 3/15/2019. (CBC) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#11

(#11) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint, filed by Charles M. Shorter.(Lewis, Richard) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

10 #2

Exhibit(s) Amended Short Form Complaint-red lined

10 #1

Exhibit(s) Amended Short Form Complaint

#10

(#10) Unopposed First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint with attached Certificate of Service filed by Charles M. Shorter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Amended Short Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Amended Short Form Complaint-red lined)(Lewis, Richard) Modified text on 2/25/2019 (MMP). (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie W O'Leary on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (O'Leary, Leslie) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles M. Shorter. Arizant Healthcare, Inc. served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Lewis, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles M. Shorter. 3M Company served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Lewis, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6670355) filed by Charles M. Shorter. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lewis, Richard) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (MMG). (Entered: 02/13/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles M. Shorter. Arizant Healthcare, Inc. served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service)(Lewis, Richard) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles M. Shorter. 3M Company served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service)(Lewis, Richard) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (MMP) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. filed by Charles M. Shorter. Filer requests summons issued. (Lewis, Richard) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Short Form Complaint [ECF No. #10 ] is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 3/15/2019. (CBC) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint, filed by Charles M. Shorter.(Lewis, Richard) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint with attached Certificate of Service filed by Charles M. Shorter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Amended Short Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Amended Short Form Complaint-red lined)(Lewis, Richard) Modified text on 2/25/2019 (MMP). (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie W O'Leary on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (O'Leary, Leslie) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles M. Shorter. Arizant Healthcare, Inc. served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Lewis, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles M. Shorter. 3M Company served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Lewis, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MDL PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: Establishing Procedures. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016. (MMG) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • (#5) (Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2666 (JNE/DTS). Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2666-JNE-DTS. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Bair Hugger MDL website at: # www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Bair-Hugger/index.shtml . (MMG) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (MMG) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • (#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Bruce Wernik, Leslie W. O'Leary as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMG) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-353 JNE/DTS. (MMG) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6670355) filed by Charles M. Shorter. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lewis, Richard) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (MMG). (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arizant Healthcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard S Lewis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leslie W. O'Leary