This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:24:24 (UTC).

SHORT V. MERRICK BANK CORPORATION, ETAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 SHORT filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against MERRICK BANK CORPORATION, ETAL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00280

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TARA SHORT

Defendants

MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARIELLEN CYNTHIA BEAM EDINBURG

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT GITMEID & ASSOC PLLC

3411 Silverside Rd Suite 104-204

Wilmington, DE 19810

Defendant Attorney

JAKOB F. WILLIAMS

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market St Ste 2620

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 6/21/22. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 7/21/22; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/21/22. 3/21/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Report Of Rule 26F Joint Report by TARA SHORT. (EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

6 #2

JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F

6 #1

ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) STIPULATION ORDER THAT DEFENDANT, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 3/28/2022, TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/1/22. 3/1/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TARA SHORT As To Merrick Bank(EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Return of service on Equifax on 2/1/22 by personal service by TARA SHORT as to Equifax (EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) Modified on 2/15/2022 (lvj). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#2

(#2) Return of service, served 2/4/22 as to Merrick Bank by personal service by TARA SHORT (EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) Modified on 2/15/2022 (lvj). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Affidavit

1 #1

Designation Form

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 6/21/22. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 7/21/22; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/21/22. 3/21/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE Pretrial/RULE 16 Conference held on 3/21/22. (JL) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report Of Rule 26F Joint Report by TARA SHORT. (EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF RESET VIDEO CONFERENCE:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RESET FOR 3/21/2022 12:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov.(amw) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/18/2022 12:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov NO LATER THAN 5 DAYS PRIOR TO CONFERENCE. (Attachments: #1 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER, #2 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F)(amw) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION ORDER THAT DEFENDANT, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 3/28/2022, TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/1/22. 3/1/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TARA SHORT As To Merrick Bank(EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of service on Equifax on 2/1/22 by personal service by TARA SHORT as to Equifax (EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) Modified on 2/15/2022 (lvj). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Return of service, served 2/4/22 as to Merrick Bank by personal service by TARA SHORT (EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) Modified on 2/15/2022 (lvj). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, MERRICK BANK CORPORATION. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/25/22 (bw, ) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by TARA SHORT. (JL) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX, MERRICK BANK CORP. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15677997.), filed by Tara Short. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merrick Bank Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAKOB F. WILLIAMS