This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2020 at 08:03:24 (UTC).

Short et al v. Federal Highway Administration et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 Short filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Federal Highway Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel L. Hovland, Clare R. Hochhalter and Daniel M. Traynor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00285

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

Presiding Judges

Daniel L. Hovland

Daniel M. Traynor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sandra Short

David Short

Donald Short

Dave Short

Don Short

Sandy Short

Sarah Sarbacker

Petitioner

Billings County, North Dakota

Defendants

United States Forest Service

Lee Potter

Federal Highway Administration

William P. O'Donnell

Shannon Boem

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derrick L. Braaten

Attorney at Braaten Law Firm

109 N 4Th Street, Suite 100

Bismarck, ND 58501

JJ William England

Attorney at Braaten Law Firm

109 North 4Th St., Suite 100

Bismarck, ND 58501

Petitioner Attorneys

Elizabeth Dawson

1001 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Bennett L. Johnson

Attorney at Vogel Law Firm

200 North 3Rd Street, Suite 201

Bismarck, ND 58501

Tami Norgard

Attorney at VOGEL LAW FIRM

218 Np Avenue, Po Box 1389

Fargo, ND 58107-1389

H. Patrick Weir, Sr.

Attorney at VOGEL LAW FIRM

Po Box 2097

Bismarck, ND 58502-2097

Robert Timothy McCrum

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

Defendant Attorneys

Michael D. Schoepf

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

P.O. Box 699

Bismarck, ND 58502

James P. Thomas

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

Po Box 699

Bismarck, ND 58502

Sarah E. Wall

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

Po Box 699

Bismarck, ND 58502

 

Court Documents

11 #2

Exhibit A to Declaration of JJ England -- Final Environmental Impact Sta

11 #1

Declaration of JJ England

#11

#10

#8

6 #1

Proposed Answer

#6

#5

4 #4

Tracking ID: 70180680000176122849

4 #3

Tracking ID: 70180680000176122818

4 #2

Tracking ID: 70180680000176122801

4 #1

Tracking ID: 70180680000176122825

#4

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Sarah Sarbacker, David Short, Donald Short, Sandra Short. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JJ England, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of JJ England -- Final Environmental Impact Statement and Record of Decision (FEIS/ROD))(England, JJ) Modified on 2/20/2020 to remove exhibit language (am). (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Shannon Boem, Federal Highway Administration, William P. O'Donnell, Lee Potter, United States Forest Service. (Wall, Sarah) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Shannon Boem answer due 4/25/2020; William P. O'Donnell answer due 4/25/2020; Lee Potter answer due 4/25/2020. (rh) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Federal Highway Administration answer due by 4/25/2020; United States Forest Service answer due by 4/25/2020. (BG) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Clerk's Office added link. (cjs) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Shannon Boem, Federal Highway Administration, William P. O'Donnell, Lee Potter. (Wall, Sarah) Modified on 2/10/2020 to add link (cjs). (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#7) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte.Case reassigned to Judge Daniel M. Traynor for all further proceedings. Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. (kmk) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Billings County, North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer)(rh) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Intervene by Billings County, North Dakota. (rh) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Summons Returned Executed. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA at #4 . (js) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Shannon Boem served on 12/30/2019, answer due 3/3/2020; Federal Highway Administration served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; William P. O'Donnell served on 12/30/2019, answer due 3/3/2020; Lee Potter served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; United States Forest Service served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Tracking ID: 70180680000176122825, #2 Tracking ID: 70180680000176122801, #3 Tracking ID: 70180680000176122818, #4 Tracking ID: 70180680000176122849)(js) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer Deadlines Terminated. (js) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Sarbacker, Donald Short, Sandra Short, David Short. All Defendants (England, JJ) Modified on 1/6/2020 to restrict access. (js) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Shannon Boem, Federal Highway Administration, William P. O'Donnell, Lee Potter, United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cjs) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Shannon Boem, Federal Highway Administration, William P. O'Donnell, Lee Potter, United States Forest Service (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000288) filed by Sarah Sarbacker, Donald Short, Sandra Short, David Short. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Highway Administration is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer H. Patrick Weir, Sr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R. Timothy McCrum