This case was last updated from PACER on 11/01/2020 at 09:52:38 (UTC).

Shore v. Saul

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Shore filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01169

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wendy L. Shore

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary C. Linarducci

Attorney at Linarducci & Butler, PA

910 West Basin Road, Suite 100

New Castle, DE 19720

Defendant Attorney

Heather Benderson

Attorney at Social Security Administration

P.O. Box 41777

Philadelphia, PA 19101

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summonses served on U.S. Attorney General, Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney on September 10, 2020, filed by Wendy L. Shore. (Linarducci, Gary) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Benderson, Heather) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Andrew Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3171836.) - filed by Wendy L. Shore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less