This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/12/2019 at 07:54:16 (UTC).

Shook v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. et al (TV3)

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 Shook filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc TV3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas A Varlan and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00053

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Golden Shook

Defendants

Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.

PTVO Owners Association, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua Isaac Goldman

Attorney at Totten, Franqui, Davis & Burk LLC

222 2Nd Avenue South, Suite 1700

Nashville, TN 37201

Defendant Attorneys

Paul S Davidson

Attorney at Waller, Lansden, Dortch & Davis, LLP (Nashville)

511 Union Street, Suite 2700, Post Office 198966

Nashville, TN 37219-8966

Keith William Randall

Attorney at Waller, Lansden, Dortch & Davis, LLP (Nashville)

511 Union Street, Suite 2700, Post Office 198966

Nashville, TN 37219-8966

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Other Unreported Cases for Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff&

#15

14 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#14

13 #2

Other Unreported Cases in Support

13 #1

Exhibit 1 - Agreement

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by PTVO Owners Association, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Unreported Cases for Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PTVO Owners Association, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #2 Other Unreported Cases in Support)(Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PTVO Owners Association, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE by PTVO Owners Association, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Golden Shook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goldman, Joshua) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint on or before March 21, 2019. If Defendants file a motion to dismiss, Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion on or before April 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 2/20/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 2/21/2019 to indicate c/m to Joshua Goldman (ABF). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PTVO Owners Association, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137, it is hereby ORDERED that the above referenced case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas A. Varlan, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/13/19. (c/m to Joshua L Goldman, Totten, Franqui, Davis & Burk LLC, 222 2nd Avenue South, Suite 1700Nashville, TN 37201 (ABF) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 2/12/2019. (AML, ) Mailed to Attorney Goldman (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 2/12/2019. (AML, ) Mailed to Attorney Joshua Goldman (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 2/12/2019. (AML, ) Mailed to Attorney Goldman (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorney Joshua Goldman. Copy of Notice mailed to Attorney. (AML, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • District Judge R Leon Jordan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AML, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by PTVO Owners Association, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Corporate Parent Destinations, Inc. Wyndham for PTVO Owners Association, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sevier County Circuit Court, case number 18-cv-7631V. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3889307), filed by PTVO Owners Association, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice to Circuit Court, #2 Exhibit B-Circuit Court Pleadings, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Other Notice of Filing of Removal, #5 Other Notice to Counsel of Filing of Removal)(Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PTVO Owners Association Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. is a litigant