This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2019 at 07:56:41 (UTC).

SHOOK v. WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 SHOOK filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David S. Cercone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00726

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David S. Cercone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK

Defendants

WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC

W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rachel Stevens

Attorney at Murphy Law Group

1628 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael Groh

Attorney at Murphy Law Group, LLC

Eight Penn Center, Suite 2000, 1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael P. Murphy, Jr.

Attorney at Murphy Law Group, LLC

Eight Penn Center, Suite 2000, 1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Michalski

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Joshua Vaughn

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Christian Angotti

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Jean E. Novak

Attorney at Strassburger, McKenna, Gutnick & Gefsky

Four Gateway Center, Suite 2200, 444 Liberty Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Harry F. Kunselman

Attorney at Strassburger, McKenna, Gutnick & Gefsky

444 Liberty Avenue, Four Gateway Center, 22Nd Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Adam J. Tragone

Attorney at Strassburger McKenna Gutnick & Gefsky

444 Liberty Avenue, Four Gateway Center, Suite 2200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Vaughn, Joshua) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#26

(#26) W.D. Wright Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC.. (Kunselman, Harry) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Angotti on behalf of WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Angotti, Christian) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#24

(#24) NOTICE Opt-In Consent Form of Mary Madden by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK (Groh, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

22 #3

Proposed Order

22 #2

Exhibit A

22 #1

Affidavit of Michael Murphy, Esq.

#22

(#22) MOTION for attorney Michael Murphy, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5237267) by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Murphy, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#21

(#21) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Vaughn, Joshua) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit A

3 #1

Affidavit

#3

(#5) TEXT-ORDER granting #3 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Groh on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 6/28/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's Order or Notice on the matter. (njt) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

2 #1

Summons Wright of Pennsylvania

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC., WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Wright of Pennsylvania) (ept) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

1 #3

Summons W.D. Wright

1 #2

Summons Wright of Pennsylvania

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#26) W.D. Wright Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC.. (Kunselman, Harry) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Vaughn, Joshua) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) W.D. Wright Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC.. (Kunselman, Harry) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Angotti on behalf of WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Angotti, Christian) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE Opt-In Consent Form of Mary Madden by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK (Groh, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael P. Murphy, Jr. on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 8/7/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's Order or Notice on the matter. (njt) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for attorney Michael Murphy, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5237267) by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Murphy, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Vaughn, Joshua) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER scheduling Initial Case Management Conference for 8/28/19 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 conference to be held on or before 8/9/19. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process and Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/19/19. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/17/19. (njt) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (njt) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Jean E. Novak on behalf of W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC., WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Novak, Jean) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE Opt-In Consent Form of Alex Shaner by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK (Groh, Michael) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE Opt-In Consent Form of Donald Shook by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK (Groh, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE Opt-In Consent Form of Reed Melvin by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK (Groh, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE Opt-In Consent Form of Joseph Wiegel by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK (Groh, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT-ORDER granting #3 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Groh on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 6/28/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's Order or Notice on the matter. (njt) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Order re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK. (Groh, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (ept) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for attorney Michael Groh, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5184142) by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A) (Groh, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC., WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Wright of Pennsylvania) (ept) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC., WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5177779), filed by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Wright of Pennsylvania, #3 Summons W.D. Wright) (ept) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian Angotti

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam J. Tragone

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harry F. Kunselman