This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 07:43:17 (UTC).

Shockley v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Shockley filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-08480

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Haley Shockley

Defendants

Juul Labs, Inc.

Altria Group, Inc.

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Altria Enterprises LLC

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

Hoyoung Huh

Riaz Valani

Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc.

Alternative Ingredients, Inc.

Tobacco Technology, Inc.

eLiquitech, Inc.

McLane Company, Inc.

Eby-Brown Company, LLC

Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.

7-Eleven, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Glenn VanZandt

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, PC

234 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36103

Andy D. Birchfield, Jr.

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, PC

234 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36103

James W. Lampkin II

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, PC

234 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36103

Sydney Everett

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, PC

234 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (VanZandt, Joseph) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Defendants 7-Eleven, Inc., Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2913: Haley Shockley v. Juul Labs, Inc., et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-08480-WHO cc: JPMDL (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Defendants 7-Eleven, Inc., Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (VanZandt, Joseph) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (PERSONAL INJURY) against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-16573829). Filed by Haley Shockley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VanZandt, Joseph) (Filed on 11/1/2021) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 7-Eleven Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where eLiquitech, Inc. is a litigant