This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2022 at 08:20:49 (UTC).

Shockley v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Shockley filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas P. Barber and Anthony E. Porcelli. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00609

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas P. Barber

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Shockley

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Basil E. Adham

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

2925 Richmond Avenue., Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77098

Clint Reed

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

2925 Richmond Ave., Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77098

Russell W. Lewis, IV

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

2925 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew B. Lerner

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Suite 1700, 201 17Th St Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP

201 17Th St Nw Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Sabrina R. Gallo

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4400

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

27 #8

Exhibit H - Amended CMO No. 17

27 #7

Exhibit G - CMO No. 9

27 #6

Exhibit F - CMO No. 7

27 #5

Exhibit E - Non-Waiver Order

27 #4

Exhibit D - Stipulated Protective Order

27 #3

Exhibit C - Stipulation on fact sheets

27 #2

Exhibit B - CMO No. 12

27 #1

Exhibit A - Master Answer

#27

(#27) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Answer, #2 Exhibit B - CMO No. 12, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation on fact sheets, #4 Exhibit D - Stipulated Protective Order, #5 Exhibit E - Non-Waiver Order, #6 Exhibit F - CMO No. 7, #7 Exhibit G - CMO No. 9, #8 Exhibit H - Amended CMO No. 17)(Lerner, Matthew) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER directing the parties to confer and file one joint statement per case regarding venue, including the specific divisions, no later than April 1, 2021. See order for further detail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 A - Amended Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (Fifth))(originally filed in case 3:21-mc-11-TJC)(LRB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-00314. File received electronically (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#6

(#6) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#5

(#5) *AMENDED By Doc. #6*SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/16/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#4

(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#3

(#3) *VACATED By Doc. #4*ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21001 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/7/20. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 01/13/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15108651 filed by William Shockley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAS) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

190 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for MAY 25, 2022, at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. (SRC) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Answer, #2 Exhibit B - CMO No. 12, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation on fact sheets, #4 Exhibit D - Stipulated Protective Order, #5 Exhibit E - Non-Waiver Order, #6 Exhibit F - CMO No. 7, #7 Exhibit G - CMO No. 9, #8 Exhibit H - Amended CMO No. 17)(Lerner, Matthew) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Basil E. Adham terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff and relieved of any further responsibility in this action. The Clerk is directed to substitute Attorney Russell W. Lewis, IV as Lead Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 3/30/2022. (JMF) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by William Shockley. (Lewis, Russell) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell W. Lewis, IV on behalf of William Shockley (Lewis, Russell) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Related case(s): Yes (Lerner, Matthew) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Incorporated.. (Lerner, Matthew) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Lerner on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Lerner, Matthew) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#20) TRANSFER IN from the District of Arizona. Case assigned to District Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New Case Number: 8:22-cv-609-TPB-AEP. (AG) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) EXHIBIT to pertinent filings from MDL docket, Orders on Motions in Limine (Attachments: #1 Doc 9775, #2 Doc 9861, #3 Doc 9881, #4 Doc 10075, #5 Doc 10235, #6 Doc 10258, #7 Doc 10382, #8 Doc 10489, #9 Doc 10819, #10 Doc 10920, #11 Doc 10947, #12 Doc 11041, #13 Doc 11082, #14 Doc 11256, #15 Doc 12507, #16 Doc 12533, #17 Doc 17285, #18 Doc 17401)(LRB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT STATEMENT regarding venue and division (originally filed in case 3:21-mc-11-TJC) (LRB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER directing the parties to confer and file one joint statement per case regarding venue, including the specific divisions, no later than April 1, 2021. See order for further detail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 A - Amended Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (Fifth))(originally filed in case 3:21-mc-11-TJC)(LRB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-00314. File received electronically (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Middle District of Florida via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) *AMENDED By Doc. #6*SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/16/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *VACATED By Doc. #4*ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21001 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/7/20. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-00314-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAS) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15108651 filed by William Shockley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAS) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sabrina R. Gallo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Brian Lerner