This case was last updated from PACER on 07/31/2020 at 15:18:21 (UTC).

Shivers v. Buds, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Shivers filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Buds, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Chelsey M. Vascura. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02808

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Chelsey M. Vascura

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy Shivers

Defendant

Buds, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erica Ann Probst

Attorney at Kemp, Schaeffer & Rowe Co., LPA

88 W Mound Street

Columbus, OH 43215-5018

Defendant Attorneys

Michael S Loughry

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder Co., LPA

175 South Third Street, Suite 1000

Columbus, OH 43215-7619

Stacy Virginia Pollock

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder Co., L.P.A.

175 South Third Street, Suite 1000

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 7/7/2020. (cmw) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#9

(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The July 10, 2020 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2020. Motions to Amend due by 7/31/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 7/31/2020. Discovery due by 5/17/2021. Dispositive motions due by 6/30/2021. Primary Expert due by 3/29/2021. Rebuttal Expert due by 5/3/2021. Settlement Demand due by 8/3/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 9/7/2020. Mediation Deadline: 3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/2/2020. (daf) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#8

(#8) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Amy Shivers. (Probst, Erica) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2020 03:00 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Loughry for Defendant Buds, Inc. (Loughry, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Buds, Inc.. (Pollock, Stacy) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Buds, Inc.. The defendant was served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (daf) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (daf) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Buds, Inc.. (daf) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

1 #2

Summons Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Buds, Inc., filed by Amy Shivers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Probst, Erica) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 7/7/2020. (cmw) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The July 10, 2020 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2020. Motions to Amend due by 7/31/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 7/31/2020. Discovery due by 5/17/2021. Dispositive motions due by 6/30/2021. Primary Expert due by 3/29/2021. Rebuttal Expert due by 5/3/2021. Settlement Demand due by 8/3/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 9/7/2020. Mediation Deadline: 3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/2/2020. (daf) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Amy Shivers. (Probst, Erica) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2020 03:00 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Loughry for Defendant Buds, Inc. (Loughry, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Buds, Inc.. (Pollock, Stacy) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Buds, Inc.. The defendant was served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (daf) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (daf) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Buds, Inc.. (daf) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0648-7487599 (daf) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Buds, Inc., filed by Amy Shivers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Probst, Erica) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less