This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2023 at 08:10:11 (UTC).

SHIVERS et al v. NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 SHIVERS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Evelyn Padin and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-07435

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Evelyn Padin

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RONALD SHIVERS

CARISSA SEWELL

Defendants

NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC

NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/K/A NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/KA/ NATIONAL FREIGHT INC

NATIONAL INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION

NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION

NEVILLE P. DUHANEY

JOHN DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRYAN MICHAEL ROBERTS

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER EUGENE MCINTYRE

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC, NATIONAL INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/K/A NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/KA/ NATIONAL FREIGHT INC from MIDDLESEX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number MID-L-5493-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13910679), filed by NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC, NATIONAL INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/K/A NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/KA/ NATIONAL FREIGHT INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/K/A NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/KA/ NATIONAL FREIGHT INC, NATIONAL INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION. (MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/K/A NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/KA/ NATIONAL FREIGHT INC, NATIONAL INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION.(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#4

(#4) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/28/2023 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/5/23. (LM, ) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#5

(#5) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/K/A NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/KA/ NATIONAL FREIGHT INC, NATIONAL INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION.(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARISSA SEWELL, RONALD SHIVERS. NEVILLE P. DUHANEY served on 12/14/2022, answer due 1/4/2023. (ROBERTS, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARISSA SEWELL, RONALD SHIVERS. NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/K/A NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/KA/ NATIONAL FREIGHT INC served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (ROBERTS, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARISSA SEWELL, RONALD SHIVERS. NATIONAL INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (ROBERTS, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARISSA SEWELL, RONALD SHIVERS. NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (ROBERTS, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARISSA SEWELL, RONALD SHIVERS. NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (ROBERTS, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

 

Docket Entries

01/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARISSA SEWELL, RONALD SHIVERS. NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (ROBERTS, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARISSA SEWELL, RONALD SHIVERS. NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (ROBERTS, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARISSA SEWELL, RONALD SHIVERS. NATIONAL INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (ROBERTS, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARISSA SEWELL, RONALD SHIVERS. NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/K/A NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/KA/ NATIONAL FREIGHT INC served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (ROBERTS, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARISSA SEWELL, RONALD SHIVERS. NEVILLE P. DUHANEY served on 12/14/2022, answer due 1/4/2023. (ROBERTS, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/K/A NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/KA/ NATIONAL FREIGHT INC, NATIONAL INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION.(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/28/2023 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/5/23. (LM, ) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/K/A NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/KA/ NATIONAL FREIGHT INC, NATIONAL INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION.(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketJudge Evelyn Padin and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/K/A NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/KA/ NATIONAL FREIGHT INC, NATIONAL INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION. (MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC, NATIONAL INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/K/A NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/KA/ NATIONAL FREIGHT INC from MIDDLESEX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number MID-L-5493-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13910679), filed by NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC, NATIONAL INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC D/B/A NFI TRANSPORTATION, NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/K/A NATIONAL FREIGHT INC A/KA/ NATIONAL FREIGHT INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less