This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 06:00:25 (UTC).

Shirley v. Western Air Charter, Inc

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Shirley filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Western Air Charter, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Smith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-62957

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen Shirley

Defendants

Western Air Charter, Inc.

Western Air Charter, Inc. doing business as Jet Edge International, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Scott Minick

Attorney at Jonathan S. Minick, P.A.

169 E. Flagler St., Suite 1600

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Gregory Santoro

Attorney at Gunster Yoakley & Stewart

777 S Flagler Drive, Suite 500 E

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-6194

Riley Francis Kennedy

Attorney at Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, P.A.

777 South Flagler Drive, Suite 500 East, West Palm Beach

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Composite of State Court Pleadings

#4

4 #1

Exhibit Mutual Agreement to Arbitrate Claims

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER STAYING CASE. Pursuant to the parties' #5 Stipulation, this action is STAYED pending the outcome of arbitration. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. For administrative purposes, the case is CLOSED. The parties may move to reopen the case following completion of arbitration. Motions terminated: #4 Defendant's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/13/2019. (dco) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Western Air Charter, Inc. (Santoro, Joseph) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), ( Responses due by 12/20/2019), MOTION to Compel Arbitration ( Responses due by 12/20/2019), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Western Air Charter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mutual Agreement to Arbitrate Claims)(Kennedy, Riley) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (mee) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12190517, filed by Western Air Charter, Inc. d/b/a Jet Edge International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Composite of State Court Pleadings)(Kennedy, Riley) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN AIR CHARTER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA JET EDGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Scott Minick