This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 07:04:50 (UTC).

Shirley et al v. Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 Shirley filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wilma A. Lewis and George W. Cannon, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00259

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

Referral Judge

George W. Cannon, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Helen Shirley

New Orleans, LA 70130

Arleen Miller

New Orleans, LA 70130

Cristel Rodriguez

New Orleans, LA 70130

Josie Barnes

New Orleans, LA 70130

Rosalba Estevez

New Orleans, LA 70130

and all others similarly situated

365 Canal Street, Ste. 1170

New Orleans, LA 70130

Virginie George

New Orleans, LA 70130

John Sonson

New Orleans, LA 70130

Isidore Jules

New Orleans, LA 70130

Anisha Hendricks

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendants

Limetree Bay Refining, LLC

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John-Russell Bart Pate

Attorney at J.R. Pate, PC - Law Office

P.O. Box 890Royal Dane Mall 10-Aa

St. Thomas, VI 00804

Korey A Nelson

Attorney at Burns and Charest LLP

365 Canal Street Ste. 1170 , La 70130

365 Canal Street Ste. 1170, LA 70130

Vincent A. Colianni, II

Attorney at Colianni & Colianni

2120 Company Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Warren T Burns

Attorney at Burns Charest LLP

900 Jackson Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75202

Charles Jacob Gower

Attorney at Burns, Charest LLP

365 Canal St. Ste. 1170

New Orleans, LA 70130

Harry Richard Yelton

Attorney at Burns Charest LLP

365 Canal St. Ste. 1170

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Melanie S. Carter

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

One Logan Square130 N. 18Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Robert J. Kuczynski

Attorney at Law Office Of Beckstedt & Associates

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Carl A Beckstedt, III

Attorney at Beckstedt and Associate

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820-4604

 

Court Documents

22 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#22

#21

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

18 #3

Exhibit Ex. C Order

18 #2

Exhibit Ex. B Motion

18 #1

Exhibit Ex. A Complaint

#18

1 #20

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #17

Exhibit Q

1 #16

Exhibit P

1 #15

Exhibit O

1 #14

Exhibit N

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE to the Court Re: Continuation of Stay of Virgin Islands Class Action Suits by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Richard Yelton on behalf of Plaintiffs Josie Barnes, Rosalba Estevez, Virginie George, Anisha Hendricks, Isidore Jules, Arleen Miller, Cristel Rodriguez, Helen Shirley, John Sonson, and all others similarly situated (Yelton, Harry) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7-15-21, before Judge Wilma A. Lewis. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lindsay DeWaide, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 340-712-7112. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2021. (Dewaide, Lindsay) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie S. Carter on behalf of Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC (Carter, Melanie) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE Notice to Court Re: 14 Day Stay by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Motion, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Order) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #7 MOTION Leave to Engage in Third Party Jurisdictional Discovery , #8 Reply to Opposition to Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Josie Barnes, Rosalba Estevez, Virginie George, Anisha Hendricks, Isidore Jules, Arleen Miller, Cristel Rodriguez, Helen Shirley, John Sonson, and all others similarly situated. (Gower, Charles) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,, FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Response re #7 MOTION Leave to Engage in Third Party Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (WAL) dated 07/16/2021 SUMMARIZING the issues addressed at the July 15, 2021 oral argument in this matter; EMBODYING the Court's rulings to date; DISCUSSING the current status of the proceedings; MEMORIALIZING the upcoming deadlines. (MFR) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wilma A. Lewis: Omnibus Hearing held on 7/15/2021.(Court Reporter Lindsay Dewaide.) (Benjamin, Jessica). (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER (WAL) dated 07/09/2021 SCHEDULING an oral argument on both [1-5] "Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Limetree's Communications with Putative Class Members" in the instant matter and "Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Mandatory Injunction, and to Limit Communications with Class Members [and] Void Releases Signed by Class Members" filed in Cotton v. Limetree (2021-cv-0261) for July 15, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. in STX Courtroom 1 before District Judge Wilma A. Lewis. (MFR) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docket(WAL) dated 07/09/2021 SCHEDULING an oral argument on both [1-5] "Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Limetree's Communications with Putative Class Members" in the instant matter and "Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Mandatory Injunction, and to Limit Communications with Class Members [and] Void Releases Signed by Class Members" filed in Cotton v. Limetree (2021-cv-0261) for July 15, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. in STX Courtroom 1 before District Judge Wilma A. Lewis. (MFR) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #5 Response, [Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order] filed by Plaintiffs Josie Barnes, Rosalba Estevez, Virginie George, Anisha Hendricks, Isidore Jules, Arleen Miller, Cristel Rodriguez, Helen Shirley, John Sonson, and all others similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Nelson, Korey) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION Leave to Engage in Third Party Jurisdictional Discovery by Plaintiffs Josie Barnes, Rosalba Estevez, Virginie George, Anisha Hendricks, Isidore Jules, Arleen Miller, Cristel Rodriguez, Helen Shirley, John Sonson, and all others similarly situated. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gower, Charles) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Melanie S. Carter(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-942683) by Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Response re #3 Notice (Other), Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Limetree's Communications with Putative Class Members filed by Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kuczynski on behalf of Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC (Kuczynski, Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing of Amended Exhibit by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E (Amended), #2 Exhibit Q (Amended)) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC from Superior Court, Division of St. Croix, case number SX-2021-CV-00411. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-942353)filed by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Civil Cover Sheet) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where All Others Similarly Situated is a litigant