This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/16/2022 at 07:57:33 (UTC).

Shiqerukaj v. Mayorkas et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 Shiqerukaj filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Mayorkas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01269

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mr. Fitim Shiqerukaj

Fitim Shiqerukaj

Defendants

Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas

District Director Thomas Cioppa

Director Ur M. Jaddou

US AG Merrick Brian Garland

Alejandro Mayorkas

Thomas Cioppa

Ur M. Jaddou

Merrick Brian Garland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick Caston Crowley

Attorney at The Kuba Law Firm

321 Broadway

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorney

Jacqueline Roman

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

86 Chambers Street, Ste 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) WRIT OF MANDAMUS SCHEDULING ORDER: A complaint for writ of mandamus has been filed with the Court. The plaintiff shall serve the Government with both a copy of this order, plus the complaint, within 14 days from the date of this order, and submit proof of service of both. It is hereby ordered that the Government shall answer the complaint by June 24, 2022. A conference will be held on Tuesday, June 28, 2022, at 3:30pm. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/11/2022) Status Conference set for 6/28/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (ks) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Thomas Cioppa answer due 6/24/2022; Merrick Brian Garland answer due 6/24/2022; Ur M. Jaddou answer due 6/24/2022; Alejandro Mayorkas answer due 6/24/2022. (ks) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WRIT OF MANDAMUS SCHEDULING ORDER: A complaint for writ of mandamus has been filed with the Court. The plaintiff shall serve the Government with both a copy of this order, plus the complaint, within 14 days from the date of this order, and submit proof of service of both. It is hereby ordered that the Government shall answer the complaint by June 24, 2022. A conference will be held on Tuesday, June 28, 2022, at 3:30pm. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/11/2022) Status Conference set for 6/28/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (ks) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacqueline Roman on behalf of Thomas Cioppa, Merrick Brian Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Roman, Jacqueline) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Cioppa, Merrick Brian Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (vf) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Patrick Caston Crowley. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Thomas Cioppa, Merrick Brian Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas; Thomas Cioppa; Ur M. Jaddou; and Merrick Brian Garland, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Fitim Shiqerukaj..(Crowley, Patrick) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fitim Shiqerukaj..(Crowley, Patrick) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Crowley, Patrick) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Thomas Cioppa, Merrick Brian Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25735754).Document filed by Fitim Shiqerukaj..(Crowley, Patrick) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US AG Merrick Brian Garland is a litigant

Latest cases where District Director Thomas Cioppa is a litigant