This case was last updated from PACER on 02/26/2021 at 11:53:47 (UTC).

Shipp v. Memphis Business Academy

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 Shipp filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Memphis Business Academy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Sheryl H. Lipman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02933

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrice Shipp

Defendant

Memphis Business Academy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James M. Allen

Attorney at ALLEN LAW FIRM

212 Adams Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey E. Nicoson

Attorney at LEITNER, WILLIAMS, DOOLEY & NAPOLITAN, PLLC

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 300

Memphis, TN 38120

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Allen, James) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Memphis Business Academy.(Nicoson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#10

(#10) SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Thursday, March 4, 2021 at 1:30 PM via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Nicoson on behalf of Memphis Business Academy (Nicoson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrice Shipp as to Memphis Business Academy. (Allen, James) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Memphis Business Academy. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Summons by James M. Allen on behalf of Patrice Shipp. (Allen, James) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#2

(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint - Notice of Right to Sue

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint - Charge

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Memphis Business Academy (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3512291), filed by Patrice Shipp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint - Charge, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint - Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, James) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Allen, James) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Memphis Business Academy.(Nicoson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Thursday, March 4, 2021 at 1:30 PM via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Nicoson on behalf of Memphis Business Academy (Nicoson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrice Shipp as to Memphis Business Academy. (Allen, James) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Memphis Business Academy. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Summons by James M. Allen on behalf of Patrice Shipp. (Allen, James) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Memphis Business Academy (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3512291), filed by Patrice Shipp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint - Charge, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint - Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, James) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James M. Allen