This case was last updated from PACER on 02/07/2020 at 07:27:51 (UTC).

SHIPMON v. ASHFORD UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 SHIPMON filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against ASHFORD UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Bissoon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01569

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Bissoon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN SHIPMON

Defendant

ASHFORD UNIVERSITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amy Bennecoff Ginsburg

Attorney at Kimmel & Silverman P.C.

30 East Butler Pike

Ambler, PA 19002

Defendant Attorneys

John Kazmierczak

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

20 Stanwix Street, Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Anthony T King

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

One Arizona Center, 400 E. Van Buren Street, Suite 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Affidavit

#10

(#10) MOTION for attorney Anthony T. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5446463) by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Kazmierczak, John) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John Kazmierczak on behalf of ASHFORD UNIVERSITY. (Kazmierczak, John) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit Article re Mediation

#8

(#8) ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/21/20. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER, setting Case Management Conference in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/21/20. (jhi) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying Zovio as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY. (Kazmierczak, John) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY. (Kazmierczak, John) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN SHIPMON. ASHFORD UNIVERSITY served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/10/19. (jhi) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to ASHFORD UNIVERSITY (jd) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ASHFORD UNIVERSITY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5385198), filed by JOHN SHIPMON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony T. King as counsel for Defendant. The Court no longer utilizes a "sponsorship" model for pro hac vice admission. In the future, counsel must comply with the provision in Local Rule 83.2.B stating, "[a] motion for admission pro hac vice must be made[, i.e., filed,] by the attorney seeking to be admitted" (in this case, Anthony T. King). Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/29/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for attorney Anthony T. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5446463) by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Kazmierczak, John) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John Kazmierczak on behalf of ASHFORD UNIVERSITY. (Kazmierczak, John) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/21/20. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER, setting Case Management Conference in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/21/20. (jhi) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying Zovio as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY. (Kazmierczak, John) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY. (Kazmierczak, John) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN SHIPMON. ASHFORD UNIVERSITY served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/10/19. (jhi) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to ASHFORD UNIVERSITY (jd) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ASHFORD UNIVERSITY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5385198), filed by JOHN SHIPMON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ashford University, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy Bennecoff Ginsburg