This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2020 at 08:31:10 (UTC).

SHIPLEY v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORP. et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 SHIPLEY filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen P. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00440

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maureen P. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BETH SHIPLEY

Defendants

NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORP.

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sammy Y. Sugiura

Attorney at Edgar Snyder & Associates

Us Steel Tower, 600 Grant Street, 10Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Sammy Y Sugiura

Attorney at Edgar Snyder & Associates

Us Steel Tower, 600 Grant Street, 10Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORP., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY CO. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (cel) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by BETH SHIPLEY (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Sugiura, Sammy) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#2

(#2) As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 04/02/2020. (tjw) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORP., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY CO. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5540131), filed by BETH SHIPLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2020
  • DocketFINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 05/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 04/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORP., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY CO. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (cel) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by BETH SHIPLEY (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Sugiura, Sammy) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 04/02/2020. (tjw) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORP., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY CO. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5540131), filed by BETH SHIPLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less