This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 09:18:12 (UTC).

Shin v. USA

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Shin filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY and KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00390

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Patrick Shin

Respondent

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Thomas M. Otake

Attorney at Thomas M. Otake AAL, ALC

851 Fort Street Mall, Suite 400, 524-7500, Fax: 356-0418

Honolulu, HI 96813

Respondent Attorneys

Michael David Nammar

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

Prince Kuhio Federal Building, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Ste 6100, 541-2850

Honolulu, HI 96850

Sara D. Ayabe

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney-Honolulu

Prince Kuhio Federal Building, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Ste 6100

Honolulu, HI 96850

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Certificate of Service

5 #1

Declaration of Sara D. Ayabe

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Government's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time In Which to Respond to Second Petition for Writ of Error Coram Nobis Sara D. Ayabe appearing for Respondent USA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sara D. Ayabe, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ayabe, Sara) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara D. Ayabe on behalf of USA on behalf of USA. (Ayabe, Sara) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) Defendants Second Coram Nobis MOTION - Thomas M. Otake appearing for Petitioner Patrick Shin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(jo) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EO: The Government's motion for an extension is granted. The Government's new deadline for responding to the coram nobis petition is November 25, 2020. Mr. Shin may file an optional reply memorandum by December 9, 2020. re #5 . (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(cib) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Government's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time In Which to Respond to Second Petition for Writ of Error Coram Nobis Sara D. Ayabe appearing for Respondent USA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sara D. Ayabe, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ayabe, Sara) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara D. Ayabe on behalf of USA on behalf of USA. (Ayabe, Sara) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • Docket(#3) EO: The Government's response to the coram nobis petition is due by October 26, 2020. Mr. Shin's optional reply memorandum should be filed by November 9, 2020. (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(tl) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00390 SOM-KJM on all further pleadings. All docket entries relative to the Coram Nobis Motion will be entered in both cases: CR 04-00150 SOM-1 and CV 20-00390 SOM-KJM. Please reflect the two case numbers on all further filings. (jo) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Defendants Second Coram Nobis MOTION - Thomas M. Otake appearing for Petitioner Patrick Shin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(jo) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less