This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:09:29 (UTC).

Shijie Yin v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Shijie Yin filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christina A. Snyder and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08647

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shijie Yin

Defendants

United States of America

City of Los Angeles

County of Los Angeles

California Department of Transportation

Does 1 to 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John R Rofael

Attorney at Downtown LA Law Group

601 North Vermont Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Defendant Attorney

Joseph William Tursi

Attorney at AUSA - US Attorneys Office

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32258709 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN. (Attorney John R Rofael added to party SHIJIE YIN(pty:pla))(Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN. (Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN, (Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN. (Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN. (Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN. (Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN. (Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-08647 CAS(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States of America answer now due 2/3/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Attorney Joseph William Tursi added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Shijie Yin pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to California Department of Transportation. (Rofael, John) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docket(#16) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DECLARATION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court reviewed Plaintiffs declaration. (Docket # 14.) The previous order is DISCHARGED with no further consequence. re: Declaration #14 . (vm) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION of John Rofael re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #13 Regarding Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Shijie Yin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit John Rofael Re Proof of service)(Rofael, John) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF PROCESS IN CIVIL ACTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Plaintiff may discharge this order by filing a statement (not to exceed 3 pages) plus proof of service of process by or before December 13, 2021. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant California Department of Transportation. (ghap) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant County of Los Angeles. (ghap) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant City of Los Angeles. (ghap) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (ghap) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (ghap) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN. (Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN. (Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN. (Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN. (Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN, (Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN. (Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32258709 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff SHIJIE YIN. (Attorney John R Rofael added to party SHIJIE YIN(pty:pla))(Rofael, John) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant