This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2022 at 09:09:36 (UTC).

Shifflett v. Ethicon Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Shifflett filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00236

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandra Shifflett

Defendants

Ethicon Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fletcher V. Trammell

Attorney at Trammell PC

3262 Westheimer Rd., Suite 423

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorney

G. Brian Jackson

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP -TN

Suite 1600, 150 3Rd Avenue South

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by G. Brian Jackson on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jackson, G.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#3

(#3) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26 Requirements for Record Preservation and Prima Facie Evidence of Implant, Injury and Causation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/13/2021. (rsg) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Order Re: Qualified Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/20/2021. (rsg) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Re: Qualified Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/20/2021. (rsg) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26 Requirements for Record Preservation and Prima Facie Evidence of Implant, Injury and Causation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/13/2021. (rsg) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by G. Brian Jackson on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jackson, G.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sandra Shifflett. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11531555) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer G. Brian Jackson