This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:52:23 (UTC).

Shiffer v. United States Of America

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Shiffer filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against United States Of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02076

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Madasan Shiffer

Defendant

United States Of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David B. Dowling

Attorney at Cunningham, Chernicoff & Warshawsky, PC

2320 North Second Street, P.O. Box 60457

Harrisburg, PA 17108-1146

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Madasan Shiffer. (Dowling, David) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE REPORT by Madasan Shiffer by Madasan Shiffer.(Dowling, David) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Madasan Shiffer (Dowling, David) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/11/2019. (jr) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

2 #1

Summons Packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to United States Of America and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Of America ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4946955), filed by Madasan Shiffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Madasan Shiffer. (Dowling, David) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE REPORT by Madasan Shiffer by Madasan Shiffer.(Dowling, David) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Madasan Shiffer (Dowling, David) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/11/2019. (jr) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to United States Of America and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Of America ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4946955), filed by Madasan Shiffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.