This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/12/2020 at 08:49:30 (UTC).

Shields v. The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 Shields filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-04017

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam Shields

Defendant

Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Darrell Currie

Attorney at Grefe & Sidney PLC

500 E Court Avenue, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

Adam D Zenor

Attorney at Grefe & Sidney, PLC

500 East Court Avenue, Suite 200, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

Sean M Corpstein

Attorney at Grefe & Sidney

500 E Court Avenue #200, Po Box 10434, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50306

Matthew Sahag

Attorney at Dickey & Campbell Law Firm PLC

301 East Walnut St, Suite 1, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

Defendant Attorneys

Coreen K Sweeney

Attorney at Nyemaster Goode PC

700 Walnut Street, Suite 1600

Des Moines, IA 50309

Keith Patrick Duffy

Attorney at Nyemaster Goode, PC

700 Walnut Street, Suite 1600, Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Petition

1 #2

Exhibit B - Original Notice

1 #3

Exhibit C - Acceptance of Service

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #5 State Court Petition by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, The.(Sweeney, Coreen) Modified text on 4/20/2020 (skm). (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 4/15/2020. (skm) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Adam Shields (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (skm) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the new civil removal case packet. (skm) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketChief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (conflicts checked; none found). (skm) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Coreen K Sweeney on behalf of The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Sweeney, Coreen) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Duffy, Keith) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Woodbury County, case number LACV190749. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3160879), filed by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. Scheduling Report due by 5/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Original Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Acceptance of Service) (Duffy, Keith) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coreen K Sweeney