This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2019 at 07:38:53 (UTC).

Shields v. Leeds, City of

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 Shields filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Leeds, City of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Staci G Cornelius and R David Proctor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00922

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Staci G Cornelius

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Shields

Defendant

Leeds, City of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Thomas Morro

Attorney at MORRO LAW CENTER

P O Box 1644

Gardendale, AL 35071

Defendant Attorneys

Grace Graham

Attorney at ELLIS HEAD OWENS & JUSTICE

113 N. Main Street, P.O. Box 587

Columbiana, AL 35202-0647

J Bentley Owens, III

Attorney at ELLIS HEAD OWENS & JUSTICE

Po Box 587

Columbiana, AL 35051

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Leeds, City of. Leeds, City of waiver sent on 6/19/19, answer due 8/18/19. (Owens, J) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by John Shields. (Morro, Scott) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by J Bentley Owens, III on behalf of Leeds, City of (Owens, J) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Graham on behalf of Leeds, City of (Graham, Grace) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Leeds, City of, filed by John Shields.(MRR, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19-cv-922-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Graham on behalf of Leeds, City of (Graham, Grace) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19-cv-922-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Reset Deadlines: Leeds, City of answer due 8/18/2019. (MRR, ) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Leeds, City of. Leeds, City of waiver sent on 6/19/19, answer due 8/18/19. (Owens, J) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by J Bentley Owens, III on behalf of Leeds, City of (Owens, J) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by John Shields. (Morro, Scott) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3371730 (B4601098527). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Leeds, City of, filed by John Shields.(MRR, ). (Morro, Scott) Modified on 6/19/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Leeds, City of, filed by John Shields.(MRR, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.